judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

DIEHL (KEVIN) VS. STATE

Case Information: 34753
Short Caption:DIEHL (KEVIN) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Washoe Co. - Second Judicial District - CR98P1266Classification:Criminal Appeal - Fast Track - Post-Conviction
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
08/31/1999Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
08/31/1999Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Fast Track. Fast track appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Fast Track Notice mailed to all counsel.) 99-08167
09/29/1999MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. 99-09342
10/11/1999TranscriptFiled Transcript. Proceedings: July 2, 1999. Court Reporter: Nicole Alexander. 99-09775
10/26/1999Order/ProceduralFiled Order Extending Time. The fast track statement shall be filed within 15 days from the date of this order. 99-10496
10/29/1999Fast Track BriefFiled Fast Track Statement. 99-10622
11/10/1999Fast Track BriefFiled Fast Track Response. 99-11111
06/13/2000Order/DispositionalFiled Order Dismissing Appeal. "ORDER this appeal dismissed." SNP99B-WM/MS/NB 00-09970
07/11/2000RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 00-11850
07/11/2000Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
07/19/2000RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on July 13, 2000. 00-11850