judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

MARSHALL BATTEN v. WYOMING DEPARTMENT OF TRANSPORTATION DRIVERS LICENSE DIVISION

Case Heading (06-290)
Case Number:06-290Case Docketed On:12/26/2006
Status:Closed
Original Court:Third Judicial District Uinta CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Civil - Motor Vehicles (Title 31)
Short Title:MARSHALL BATTEN v. WYOMING DEPARTMENT OF TRANSPORTATION DRIVERS LICENSE DIVISION
Full Title:MARSHALL BATTEN, Appellant (Petitioner), v. WYOMING DEPARTMENT OF TRANSPORTATION DRIVERS LICENSE DIVISION, Appellee (Respondent).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantMarshall BattenMike Cornia
AppelleeDepartment of Transportation - Driver Services ProgramPatrick J. Crank
Robin Sessions Cooley
Douglas J. Moench
David James Willms

- Case Decision Information
Issues:Administrative Law and Procedure, Criminal Law -DUI, Criminal Law -Search and Seizure, Other
Opinion Number:2007 WY 173
Citation:

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
12/26/2006Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
12/26/2006Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
12/26/2006Fees - Docket fee receivedFeesDocket fee receivedFinal
12/26/2006Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
02/05/2007Motion - Extension of time - brief of appellantMotionExtension of time - briefFinal
02/05/2007Order - Grant - extension of time - brief of appellantOrderGrant - extension of timeFinal
03/12/2007Motion - Extension of time - brief of appellantMotionExtension of time - briefFinal
03/12/2007Order - Grant - extension of time - brief of appellantOrderGrant - extension of timeFinal
04/02/2007Brief - Appellant; and received copy on diskBriefAppellantFinal
05/14/2007Brief - Appellee; received copy on disk and copy of designation of record on appealBriefAppelleeFinal
05/21/2007Notice-Internal - Expedite recommendationNotice-InternalBrief only recommendationFinal
06/01/2007Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appealNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
06/04/2007Order - Assigning to expedited docketOrderAssigning to brief only docketFinal
06/11/2007Record - Transmitted record on appeal, two volumes. Volume I, original papers; Volume II, agency record.RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
06/11/2007Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
11/02/2007Opinion - Opinion and journal order affirming. Justice Kite writing for the court.OpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
11/20/2007Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
11/20/2007Record - Record returned to district courtRecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
11/20/2007Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
11/20/2007Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
11/28/2007Service - Certified mail signature return cardServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal