judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

ANTONIO R. YOUNG V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 10-CF-0853
Short Caption:ANTONIO R. YOUNG V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Assault Related
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:CF2-16506-09Filed Date:07/06/2010

Opening Event Date:07/06/2010Case Status:Decided/Dismissed
Record Completed:10/07/2010Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:01/11/2011
Argued/Submitted:05/17/2011
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:03/22/2012
Costs Waived

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantAntonio R. Young Y
Bruce A. Johnson, Jr.YN
AppelleeUnited StatesN
Roy W. McLeese, IIINN
Elizabeth TrosmanNY

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
07/06/2010NOTICE OF APPEAL
07/27/2010 On consideration of the notice of appeal and it appearing that appellant has been found eligible for court appointed counsel, it is ORDERED that Bruce A. Johnson, Jr., Esquire, is ereby appointed to represent appellant in this appeal. It is FURTHER ORDERED that counsel for appellant shall immediately take the necessary steps to review the trial court record and to ensure that the transcripts necessary to the appeal have been ordered and shall, within 30 days from the date of this order complete and file with this court a single copy of the statement regarding transcript available for completion online. Where transcript(s) necessary for this appeal have been ordered and completed for non-appeal purposes, appellant must advise the Court Reporting and Recording Division to forward said transcript(s) for inclusion in the record on appeal. (JAC)
07/27/2010APPOINTING COUNSEL/COURT ORDER REFERRAL (CJA) Bruce A. Johnson, Jr., Esquire
08/06/2010STATEMENT REGARDING TRANSCRIPT(S) (Rt ordered/needed (pii)
08/06/2010RECEIVED - motion for appeals transcript
10/07/2010SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #1 (63 pgs/Ronan) 4//7/10 proc.
10/07/2010SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #2 (243 pgs/Ronan) 4/7-8/10 proc.
10/07/2010SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #3 (251 pgs/Kaczorowski) 4/12-15/10 proc.
10/07/2010SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #4 (29 pgs/tape) 6/14/10 proc. w/cd
10/07/2010RECORD COMPLETED
10/12/2010RECORD INDEX
10/12/2010RECORD COPIES
10/12/2010SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #5 (SEALED pleadings)
10/15/2010 It appearing that the complete record on appeal has been filed with this court, it is ORDERED that appellant's brief and the limited appendix including the documents required by D.C. App. R. 30 (f), shall be filed within 40 days from the date of this order, and appellee's brief shall be filed within 30 days thereafter. See D.C. App. R. 31. (Castillo)
11/23/2010APLT MOTION FOR LEAVE TO SUPPLEMENT THE RECORD (no oppo)
11/29/2010APPELLANT'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE BRIEF (no oppo).
11/29/2010RECEIVED Appellant's Brief.
11/29/2010RECEIVED Appendix to Appellant's Brief.
12/02/2010ORDERED that the appellant's motion to supplement the record is granted and the lodged Government Exhibits 16, 18, 19, 20 and 21, all contained in the appellant's appendix are filed as a supplemental record. F/O that the appellant's motion for leave to file the lodged brief is granted and the lodged brief and limited appendix are filed. F/O that the brief of appellee shall be filed within 30 days from the date of this order (JAC)
12/02/2010APPELLANT'S BRIEF
12/02/2010APPENDIX
12/02/2010SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #6 (Government Exhibits 16, 18, 19, 20 and 21 contained in the appellant's appendix)
01/03/2011APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF to 8 days. no oppo
01/05/2011 On consideration of appellee's motion for an extension of time within which to file the brief, to which no opposition has been filed, it is ORDERED that the motion is granted and appellee's brief shall be filed on or before January 11, 2011. (JAC)
01/11/2011APPELLEE'S BRIEF
01/11/2011BRIEFS COMPLETED
01/19/2011APPELLANT'S REPLY BRIEF
03/18/2011FINAL SCREENING - SUMMARY CALENDAR I
04/05/2011CALENDAR NOTICE SENT
05/17/2011FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
05/17/2011SUBMITTED to Glickman,Belson,Nebeker.
02/29/2012FiledAffirmed (MOJ) (Glickman, Associate Judge, and Nebeker and Belson, Senior Judges.)
03/22/2012FiledMandate