judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court Record

ATLAS METAL WORKS v. REPUBLIC NATIONAL BANK OF DALLAS

Case: A-35
A-35
01/18/1944
Application for Writ of Error
ATLAS METAL WORKS
REPUBLIC NATIONAL BANK OF DALLAS
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
02/17/1944Motion for RehearingPetitioner
01/29/1944Response to Brief filedRespondent
01/28/1944Brief in Support of PetitionPetitioner
01/26/1944Response to PetitionRespondent
01/18/1944Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
02/19/1944Response to Motion filed
02/17/1944Motion for RehearingOverruled
01/29/1944Response to Brief filed
01/28/1944Brief in Support of Petition
01/26/1944Response to Petition
01/18/1944Application for Writ of Error - FiledRefused
01/18/1944Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Atlas Metal WorksPetitioner
Republic National Bank of DallasRespondent
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information