Case: 13-05-00012-CV
13-05-00012-CV
01/10/2005
Unknown Civil Case Type.
GLENDA TORRES
R. Y. LIVESTOCK SALES, INC.
No
West Publishing
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document |
---|---|---|---|
No briefs. |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
09/30/2005 | Record sent to storage | | |||
09/27/2005 | Mandate Issued | | |||
06/30/2005 | Memorandum opinion issued | Dismissed |
| ||
06/03/2005 | Green card in | | |||
06/01/2005 | 10 day letter sent | | |||
04/22/2005 | Court Reporter Pages | | |||
04/22/2005 | Reporter's Record Filed | | |||
04/20/2005 | request for documents | | |||
04/19/2005 | Notice for docketing statement | | |||
03/30/2005 | ADVISORY - tickler as to event to come | | |||
03/30/2005 | request for documents | | |||
03/15/2005 | Statement Filed | | |||
03/15/2005 | docketing statement filed | | |||
03/09/2005 | Notice for docketing statement | | |||
03/09/2005 | Notice for docketing statement | | |||
03/01/2005 | 30 Day Letter Sent | | |||
02/16/2005 | Filing Fee Paid | | |||
02/03/2005 | Mot. Ext. to file Notice of Appeal Disposed | Motion or Writ Granted | | ||
02/03/2005 | Green card in | | |||
01/26/2005 | Where's f/f | | |||
01/21/2005 | Clerk's Record Filed | | |||
01/21/2005 | Clerk's Record Received | | |||
01/10/2005 | Notice of Appeal Filed | | |||
01/10/2005 | Filing Fee Paid | | |||
01/10/2005 | Mot. Ext. to file Notice of Appeal Filed | | |||
01/10/2005 | Notice of appeal received | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
09/27/2005 | Case Stored | Case stored |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
Torres, Glenda | Appellant | Hon. Kelly K. McKinnis |
R. Y. Livestock Sales, Inc. | Appellee | Hon. David J. Lumber Hon. J. Michael Moore |
Trial Court Information
County Court at Law No. 1
Hidalgo
Honorable Rodolfo Rudy Gonzalez
CL-25,456-A