Case: 03-91-00488-CV
03-91-00488-CV
11/06/1991
Contract
Carrol Rivers and Barbara Rivers
Schult Homes Corporation, Charles Devoe Treadwell, Texas Lifestyle Manufactured Housing Corporation and St. Paul Fire and Marine Insurance Company
No
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document |
---|---|---|---|
No briefs. |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
11/07/2003 | Case file was destroyed per retention schedule | | |||
04/05/1995 | CASE STORED | | |||
02/18/1993 | Exhibits destroyed | | |||
12/30/1992 | Letter requesting pickup of exhibits | | |||
12/30/1992 | Mandate Issued | | |||
07/08/1992 | Opinion issued | Affirmed |
| ||
06/10/1992 | Submitted | | |||
06/10/1992 | Submission | | |||
05/11/1992 | Submission | | |||
01/09/1992 | Brief filed | | |||
01/09/1992 | Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp. | Motion or Writ Granted | | ||
12/31/1991 | Brief filed | | |||
12/31/1991 | Case ready to be set | | |||
12/31/1991 | Mot. for Ext. to File Brief | | |||
12/06/1991 | Brief filed | | |||
11/06/1991 | Exhibits filed | | |||
11/06/1991 | Transcript & SF Filed | | |||
11/06/1991 | Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
12/30/1992 | Case Stored | Case stored |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
Texas Lifestyle Manufactured H | Appellee | Mr. Michael D. Earney |
Schult Homes Corporation | Appellee | Mr. William L. Ehrle, Sr. |
Rivers, Carrol & Barbara | Appellant | Mr. Wade Arledge |
St. Paul Fire & Marine Ins.co. | Appellee | Ms. Paula C. Wong |
Treadwell, Charles Devoe | Appellee | Mr. Michael D. Earney |
Trial Court Information
53rd District Court
Travis
Honorable John K. Dietz
453,511