Case: 04-05-00698-CR
04-05-00698-CR
09/30/2005
Aggravated Sexual Assault
Gilbert De Los Santos
The State of Texas
No
West Publishing
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document |
---|---|---|---|
No briefs. |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document |
---|---|---|---|
03/03/2008 | Letter filed | | |
02/20/2007 | Mandate received by the trial court | | |
02/20/2007 | Mandate Executed By The Trial Court | | |
02/15/2007 | Mandate Issued | | |
11/22/2006 | Opinion issued | Affirmed | |
10/10/2006 | Submitted | | |
09/07/2006 | Submission | | |
07/26/2006 | Generate a formal court order | | |
07/24/2006 | Case ready to be set | | |
07/20/2006 | Mot. EOT to file Brief Filed | | |
07/18/2006 | Brief Filed | | |
07/10/2006 | Mot. EOT to file Brief Filed | | |
06/09/2006 | Mot. EOT to file Brief Disp/Per Curiam/Clerk's Order | Motion or Writ Granted | |
06/08/2006 | Mot. EOT to file Brief Filed | | |
05/11/2006 | Motion for Leave Filed | | |
05/08/2006 | Waives Oral Argument | | |
05/08/2006 | Brief Filed | | |
05/08/2006 | Mot. EOT to file Brief Filed | | |
02/15/2006 | Mot. EOT to file Brief Filed | | |
02/08/2006 | 10 Day letter to attorneys on no app's br filed | | |
12/29/2005 | Reporters Record Filed | | |
12/15/2005 | Generate a formal court order | | |
12/15/2005 | Notification Of Late Reporter's Record | Motion or Writ Granted | |
12/07/2005 | Notification Of Late Reporter's Record | | |
12/05/2005 | Late Record Letter To Court Reporter | | |
11/28/2005 | Docketing Statement Filed | | |
10/06/2005 | Generate a formal court order | | |
09/30/2005 | Staff Attorney has been assigned to the case | | |
09/30/2005 | Clerks Record Filed | | |
09/30/2005 | Notice of Appeal Filed | | |
09/06/2005 | Notice of Appeal Filed | | |
07/25/2005 | Motion for New Trial Filed | | |
07/15/2005 | Date of Sentencing in Trial Court | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
02/15/2007 | Case Stored | Case stored |
10/15/2009 | Retention | Criminal case to be retained permanently (sentence over 20 years or historical value) |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
De Los Santos, Gilbert | Criminal - Appellant | Suzanne M. Kramer |
The State of Texas | Criminal - State of Texas | Christina Hartmann |
Trial Court Information
81st Judicial District Court
Karnes
Honorable Donna S. Rayes
04-12-00186-CRK
90 years $10,000 fine