judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

RADER (RUSSELL) VS. STATE

Case Information: 34746
Short Caption:RADER (RUSSELL) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C147465Classification:Criminal Appeal - Fast Track - Direct
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
08/30/1999Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
08/30/1999Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Fast Track. Fast track appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Fast Track Notice mailed to all counsel.) 99-08076
10/19/1999Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Fast Track. Counsel for appellant shall file and serve the fast track statement and appendix within 10 days of this order or show cause why counsel for appellant should not be sanctioned. 99-10125
11/02/1999Fast Track BriefFiled Fast Track Statement. 99-10708
11/02/1999AppendixFiled Appendix to Fast Track Statement. 99-10709
11/08/1999Notice/IncomingFiled Proof of Service. 99-10959
11/18/1999MotionFiled Motion to Strike. Motion to Strike Fast Track Statement. 99-11447
11/30/1999Order/ProceduralFiled Order. The state's motion to strike the fast track statement and appendix is granted. The clerk shall strike the fast track statement and appendix filed on November 2, 1999. Counsel for appellant shall, within 5 days from the date of this order, file a transcript request form or certificate that no transcript is required and shall file and serve a fast track statement and appendix within 20 days of this order, or show cause why counsel should not be sanctioned for failure to comply with NRAP 3C. 99-11911
12/22/1999Fast Track BriefFiled Fast Track Statement. 99-13041
01/11/2000MotionFiled Motion for Excess Pages. Motion to File Fast Track Statement in Excess of 10 Pages. 00-00437
01/13/2000Order/Clerk'sFiled Clerk's Order. The eleven-page fast track response received on January 11, 2000, and the respondent's appendix received on January 12, 2000, shall be filed, forthwith. 00-00556
01/13/2000Fast Track BriefFiled Fast Track Response. 00-00439
01/13/2000AppendixFiled Appendix to Fast Track Response. 00-00525
01/18/2000TranscriptFiled Transcript. 02/16/99 (2); 02/17/99; 02/18/99 (2); Proceedings: Court Reporter: James A. Helleso. 00-00753
02/03/2000Order/ProceduralFiled Order re: Entry Written Judgment or Order. Certified copy of the judgment of conviction due: 10 days from the date of this order. 00-01712
04/24/2000Order/ProceduralFiled Order re: Entry Written Judgment or Order. The clerk of the district court has failed to respond to our order of February 3, 2000. Accordingly, the clerk of the district court shall have 10 days to transmit a certified copy of the judgment on conviction to the clerk of this court. 00-06582
05/08/2000Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled District Court Order/Judgment. Certified copy of order or judgment appealed from filed in district court on: August 30, 1999. 00-07459
05/18/2000Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Having reviewed the documents on file in this appeal, this court has concluded the transcript of the August 17, 1999 motion for a new trial is necessary for resolution of the appeal. Appellant's counsel shall file and serve a rough draft transcript request form with 10 days of this order. 00-08330
05/26/2000Transcript RequestFiled Request for Rough Draft Transcript(s). Transcripts requested: August 17, 1999. Court Reporter: James A. Helleso. Filed in district court on: May 23, 2000. 00-08920
06/05/2000TranscriptFiled Transcript. Proceedings: August 17, 1999. Court Reporter: James A. Helleso. 00-09416
11/21/2000Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. Having considered appellant's contention and concluded that it is without merit, " . . . the judgment of conviction is affirmed." NNP00A-MS/DA/ML 00-20396
12/19/2000RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 00-20732
12/19/2000Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
01/11/2001RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on December 28, 2000. 00-20732