Case Information: 10-AA-0843 | |||
Short Caption: | 620 KENNEDY STREET,LLC V. DC DEP'T OF PUBLIC WORKS | Classification: | Agency - Administrative Agency - OAH - Public Works |
Superior Court or Agency Case Number: | DPW2269-10 | Filed Date: | 07/14/2010 |
| |||
Opening Event Date: | 07/14/2010 | Case Status: | Closed |
Record Completed: | Post-Decision Matter Pending: | ||
Briefs Completed: | |||
Argued/Submitted: | |||
Disposition: | Next Scheduled Action: | ||
Mandate Issued: | 09/20/2010 |
Party Information | |||||||||
Appellate Role | Party Name | IFP | Attorney(s) | Arguing Attorney | E-Filer | ||||
Petitioner | 620 Kennedy Street LLC | N | Pro Se | N | |||||
Respondent | D.C. Department of Public Works | N |
|
Events | ||||
Event Date | Status | Description | Result | |
07/14/2010 | PETITION FOR REVIEW | |||
07/14/2010 | FILING FEE of $100.00 paid | |||
07/15/2010 | CERTIFIED COPY OF PETITION TO BOARD, OAH and Todd Kim, Esq. | |||
07/20/2010 | On consideration of the petition for review in this matter, and it appearing that 620 Kennedy Street, NW is a business that must be represented by counsel, it is ORDERED that petitioner shall within 15 days from the date of this order advise this court as to the identity of its counsel. See Moore Energy Resources, Inc. v. Public Serv. Comm'n of the District of Columbia, 785 A.2d 300, 304 (D.C. 2001); D.C. App. R. 15 (A)(5). Failure to comply with this order shall subject this petition for review to dismissal without further notice. (JAC) | |||
08/27/2010 | ORDER: This appeal is hereby dismissed. See D.C. App. R. 13. (By: ETW) | |||
08/27/2010 | DISMISSED | |||
09/20/2010 | MANDATE ISSUED | |||
04/17/2014 | Filed | Archived |