judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

THOMAS VS. SCHRADER

Case Information: 34745
Short Caption:THOMAS VS. SCHRADERCourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s): 34921
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A320120Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:09/03/1999 / Buchanan, WilliamSP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
08/30/1999Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $200.00 from Beckley Singleton Jemison Cobeaga & List, Chtd.--check no. 71758.
08/30/1999Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. 99-08072
09/01/1999Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $200.00 from Pico & Mitchell, Ltd.--check no. 013756.
09/01/1999Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. (Appellant Harry Thomas, M.D.) 99-08192
09/03/1999Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: William F. Buchanan. (Briefing and preparation of transcripts suspended pending further order of this court.)
09/24/1999MotionFiled Stipulation/Dismiss Appeal. 99-09118
10/01/1999Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The parties have agreed to a partial settlement of this matter. 99-09461
11/05/1999Order/Clerk'sFiled Clerk's Order Approving Stipulation. Order Partially Dismissing Appeal. Pursuant to the stipulation for dismissal filed September 24, 1999, " . . . we hereby dismiss the appeal of Julie A. Swain, M.D. only." The clerk shall remove Julie A. Swain, M.D. as appellant from this court's caption. 99-10900
11/22/1999Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this matter. 99-11648
12/16/1999Settlement Order/ProceduralFiled Order: No Settlement/Briefing Reinstated. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this appeal. Appellant: 15 days to file the docketing statement and to comply with NRAP 9(a); 120 days to file opening brief and appendix. Briefing shall proceed in accordance with NRAP 31(a)(1). (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellants). 99-12723
01/21/2000Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Appellants shall, within 10 days of the date of this order, file and serve a docketing statement and either a transcript request form or a certification of no transcript request or show cause why this appeal should not be dismissed as abandoned. 00-01017
02/17/2000Order/DispositionalFiled Order Dismissing Appeal. To date, appellants have failed to comply with the orders of December 16, 1999, and January 21, 2000. " . . . we hereby dismiss this appeal as abandoned." SNP99B-WM/MS/NB 00-02496
03/14/2000RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 00-03999
03/14/2000Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
03/27/2000RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on March 22, 2000. 00-03999