judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

DANIEL WILLIAM WILSON v. THE STATE OF WYOMING

Case Heading (06-16)
Case Number:06-16Case Docketed On:01/25/2006
Status:Closed
Original Court:First Judicial District Laramie CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Criminal - Offenses Against the Person 6-2-101 - 6-2-509
Short Title:DANIEL WILLIAM WILSON v. THE STATE OF WYOMING
Full Title:DANIEL WILLIAM WILSON, Appellant (Defendant), v. THE STATE OF WYOMING, Appellee (Plaintiff).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantDaniel William WilsonKenneth M. Koski
Donna D. Domonkos
Tina N. Olson
AppelleeThe State of WyomingPatrick J. Crank
Paul S. Rehurek
D. Michael Pauling
Mackenzie Williams

- Case Decision Information
Issues:
Opinion Number:2007 WY 55
Citation:

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
01/25/2006Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
01/25/2006Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
01/25/2006Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
03/13/2006Motion - Extension of time - briefMotionExtension of time - briefFinal
03/14/2006Order - Grant - extension of timeOrderGrant - extension of timeFinal
04/27/2006Motion - Extension of time - briefMotionExtension of time - briefFinal
04/28/2006Order - Grant - extension of timeOrderGrant - extension of timeFinal
06/09/2006Motion - Extension of time - briefMotionExtension of time - briefFinal
06/14/2006Order - Grant - third extension of timeOrderGrant - third extension of timeFinal
07/12/2006Brief - Appellant; received copy of brief on disk; and received copy of designation of record on appeal.BriefAppellantFinal
08/25/2006Motion - Extension of time - briefMotionExtension of time - briefFinal
08/28/2006Order - Grant - extension of timeOrderGrant - extension of timeFinal
10/11/2006Motion - Extension of time - briefMotionExtension of time - briefFinal
10/12/2006Order - Grant - extension of timeOrderGrant - extension of timeFinal
11/07/2006Notice-Incoming - Consent and Approval. Mackenzie Williams to appear on behalf of appellee.Notice-IncomingConsent and ApprovalFinal
11/07/2006Brief - Appellee; and received copy of brief on disk.BriefAppelleeFinal
11/29/2006Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appealNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
12/08/2006Record - Transmitted record on appeal, three volumes. Volume I, original papers; Volume II, transcripts; Volume III, confidential folder.RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
12/08/2006Notice-Outgoing - Transmitted record on appeal filedNotice-OutgoingTransmitted record on appeal filedFinal
12/26/2006Order - Oral argument scheduledOrderOral argument scheduledFinal
02/15/2007Event - Oral argument presented. Argued before full court (Tina N. Kerin, Post Conviction Counsel for appellant; D. Michael Pauling and Mackenzie Williams, argument by Mr. Williams for appellee) and taken under advisement.EventOral argument presentedFinal
02/15/2007Notice-Internal - Oral argument noticeNotice-InternalOral argument noticeFinal
04/06/2007Opinion - Opinion and journal order affirming. Chief Justice Voigt writing for the court.OpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
04/24/2007Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
04/24/2007Record - Record returned to district courtRecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
04/24/2007Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
04/24/2007Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
04/27/2007Service - Certified mail signature return cardServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal