judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

RICHARD ROBBINS PANCAKE V. MONICA BOYD PANCAKE

Case Information: 10-FM-0842
Short Caption:RICHARD ROBBINS PANCAKE V. MONICA BOYD PANCAKEClassification:Appeals - Family - Domestic Relations
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:DRB3676-08Filed Date:07/06/2010

Opening Event Date:07/06/2010Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:
Argued/Submitted:
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:09/09/2010

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantRichard Robbins Pancake N
Robert Case LiottaNY
AppelleeMonica Boyd Pancake N
Barbara BurrNY

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
07/06/2010NOTICE OF APPEAL
07/20/2010 ORDERED that the appellant shall, W/N 20 DAYS from the date of this order SHOW CAUSE why this appeal should not be dismissed for having been PREMATURELY FILED... See DC Code 11-721;... (BY: ETW)
07/20/2010TMC - OTSC - ROTSC
07/28/2010RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE - dated 7/20/10
08/18/2010 ORDERED that this APPEAL IS HEREBY DISMISSED but W/O PREJUDICE filing a NOA after the motions to alter or amend have been resolved. See Carter v. Cathedral Ave. Co-op, Inc., 532 A.2d 681, 683 (DC 1987)... (FITHNW) (cb)
08/18/2010DISMISSED
09/09/2010MANDATE ISSUED
09/09/2010CHANGE OF ADDRESS RECEIVED Barbara Burr - 1630 Connecticut Ave., NW
04/18/2014FiledArchived