judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

CURTIS PAYTON V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 89-CF-0907
Short Caption:CURTIS PAYTON V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Other Felony
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:F5691-87Filed Date:08/03/1989

Opening Event Date:08/03/1989Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:
Argued/Submitted:
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:02/15/1990

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantCurtis Payton N
Melissa L. Coretz NN
AppelleeUnited StatesN
John R. Fisher NN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901PAYTON, CURTIS UNITED STATES
08/03/1989FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
09/14/1989RECORD ON APPEAL JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
09/26/1989APPOINTING COUNSEL/CO REFERRAL (CJA) MELISSA L. CORETZ, ESQ. PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
10/03/1989APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT RJG PANEL SCDATE 100689 SCHPRD DSA
01/18/1990STATEMENT FROM TRIAL JUDGE REQUESTING REMAND RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
01/24/1990FiledOUTCOME/DISPOSITION - Outcome-Disposition
01/24/1990ORDER REMANDING CASE TO TRIAL CT SO JMT MAY BE VACATED & THE INDICTMENT DISMISSED. CWC PANELRO SCDATE 102589 SCHPRD RT
01/24/1990DISP NO - 01 DISP - DS METH -ORD JUDGE -RO CITE
02/15/1990MANDATE ISSUED PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD