judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

MICHAEL T. WEBB V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 89-CF-0975
Short Caption:MICHAEL T. WEBB V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Drug Related
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:F13128-88Filed Date:07/26/1989

Opening Event Date:07/26/1989Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:11/08/1989Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:08/24/1990
Argued/Submitted:01/22/1991
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:02/21/1991

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantMichael T. Webb N
Sumner J. Katz YN
AppelleeUnited StatesN
John R. Fisher YN
Guizelous O. Molock YN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901WEBB, MICHAEL T. UNITED STATES
01/01/1903NOTE - 01 CODEF: ALAN C. REID NOTE - 01
07/26/1989FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
08/17/1989APPOINTING COUNSEL/CO REFERRAL (CJA) SUMNER KATZ, ESQ. PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
09/05/1989APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT RJG PANEL SCDATE 082889 SCHPRD DSA
09/06/1989ACTION SLIP MAILED RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
09/06/1989RECORD ON APPEAL RJG PANEL SCDATE 092589 SCHPRD R
09/14/1989APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF FOR 40 DAYS AFTER TRANSCRIPT IS FILED JB PANEL SCDATE 101689 SCHPRD BA
09/25/1989SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #1 (73 PGS RT - TANNER) GT PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
10/26/1989ORDER GRANT APLT MO FOR EXT TO FILE BR; APLT BR DUE W/IN 40 DAYS AFTER RT FILED JB PANELRBH SCDATE 100589 SCHPRD U
11/07/1989SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #2 (6 PGS. -- TREMEL) RJG PANEL SCDATE 022590 SCHPRD RT
11/08/1989FiledRecord Completed
11/08/1989SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #3(33 PGS/KACZOROWSKI) AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
12/28/1989ACTION SLIP MAILED JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
01/17/1990APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 40 DAYS AFTER COMPLETION OF TRANSCRIPTS PANEL SCDATE 020690 SCHPRD BA
04/20/1990ORDER GRANT APLT MO TO EXT TIME TO FILE BRIEF, BRIEF DUE W/IN 40 DAYS AFTER RT FILED JB PANELRBH SCDATE 012990 SCHPRD U
04/25/1990SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #4 (134-PGS/HART) AJ PANEL SCDATE 080790 SCHPRD RT
04/26/1990ACTION SLIP MAILED AJ PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
06/05/1990APPELLANT'S BRIEF AD PANEL SCDATE 060590 SCHPRD BA
07/09/1990APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 8-6-90 AD PANEL SCDATE 070590 SCHPRD BE
07/30/1990ORDER GRNT APLE MO X TM TO FL BRF TO 08-06-90. NFX GR PANELRBH SCDATE 072790 SCHPRD GR
08/06/1990APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF FOR ONE DAY TO AUGUST 7, 1990 RJG PANEL SCDATE 080690 SCHPRD BE
08/07/1990RECEIVED APLE'S BRIEF AJ PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
08/24/1990FiledBriefing Completed
08/24/1990APPELEE'S BRIEF GW PANEL SCDATE 082490 SCHPRD V
01/22/1991FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
01/22/1991SUBMITTED PANELSTSCPY SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
01/29/1991AFFIRMED MOJ AF JUDGMENT ON APPEAL PANELSTSCPY SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
01/29/1991DISP NO - 01 DISP - AF METH -MOJ JUDGE -PC CITE
02/21/1991MANDATE ISSUED PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD