judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

DONNELL L. HUNTER V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 89-CF-0968
Short Caption:DONNELL L. HUNTER V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Weapons Related
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:F14672-88Filed Date:07/27/1989

Opening Event Date:07/27/1989Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:10/13/1989Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:07/27/1990
Argued/Submitted:01/02/1991
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:06/06/1991

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantDonnell L. Hunter N
James W. KleinNY
Stephen A. Thomas YN
AppelleeUnited StatesN
Elizabeth A. BreseeYN
John R. Fisher YN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901HUNTER, DONNELL L. UNITED STATES
01/01/1905TRDATE- 91/01/02 ACTION - ARG ATTY 1 - LEVICKS FOR - APPELLANT ATTY 2 - BRESEEE FOR - APPELLEE
07/27/1989FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
08/22/1989ORDER APPOINTING JAMES KLEIN, ESQ. AS COUNSEL FOR APLT. DOCKETING STATEMENT DUE IN 10 DAYS. GG PANELRO SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
09/01/1989DESIGNATION OF RECORD AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
09/01/1989APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT AD PANEL SCDATE 090189 SCHPRD DSA
09/06/1989RECEIVED REPORTER'S CERTIFICATION FROM SCHOCH - 2/13/89 THRU 2/17/89 PROC. (DUPLICATE) JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
09/26/1989SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #1 (11 PGS RT - RHOADES) GT PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
10/13/1989FiledRecord Completed
10/13/1989ACTION SLIP MAILED AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
10/13/1989RECORD ON APPEAL (272 PGS/SCHOCH) AD PANEL SCDATE 092589 SCHPRD R
10/31/1989APPELLANT'S MOTION FOR STAY UNTIL AFTER COMPLETION OF TRANSCRIPTS RJG PANEL SCDATE 112189 SCHPRD BA
11/30/1989ORDER GRANT APLT MO TO STAY BRIEFING SCHD, APLT BR DUE W/IN 40 DAYS AFTER RT FILED JB PANELRBH SCDATE 111589 SCHPRD U
01/30/1990RECEIVED CT RPTR JANIFER CERTIFICATION OF 6/19/89 PROC. (DUPLICATE REQUEST) JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
02/02/1990SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #1 (24 PGS. -- JANIFER) RJG PANEL SCDATE 012390 SCHPRD RT
02/27/1990ACTION SLIP MAILED RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
02/27/1990SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #2 (44 PGS. -- HAWKINS) RJG PANEL SCDATE 012290 SCHPRD RT
02/27/1990SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #3 (58 PGS. -- HAWKINS) RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
04/06/1990APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 5-9-90 NO OPPO AD PANEL SCDATE 040690 SCHPRD BA
04/12/1990ORDER GRANT APLT'S MO TO EXT TM TO FILE BRIEF TO 5/9/90; NFX. GW PANELDDW SCDATE 040990 SCHPRD B
05/10/1990APPELLANT'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE BRIEF AJ PANEL SCDATE 050990 SCHPRD BA
05/10/1990RECEIVED APLT'S BRIEF AJ PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
06/12/1990APPELLANT'S BRIEF JJ PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
06/12/1990ORDER GRT APLT MO FOR LV TO FL LODGE BRF; BRF OF APLE SHALL BE FL W/IN 30 DAYS OF ORDER. JJ PANELRBH SCDATE 053190 SCHPRD B
07/12/1990APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 7-26-90 NO OPPO AD PANEL SCDATE 071290 SCHPRD BE
07/19/1990ORDER GRANT APLE'S MO TO EXT TM TO FILE BRF TO 7/26/90; NFX. GW PANELFF SCDATE 071690 SCHPRD V
07/27/1990FiledBriefing Completed
07/27/1990APPELEE'S BRIEF RJG PANEL SCDATE 072690 SCHPRD BE
12/12/1990APPELLANT'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE REPLY BRIEF APPELLANT'S RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
12/12/1990RECEIVED APPELLANT'S REPLY BRIEF RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
12/13/1990APLT MOTION FOR LEAVE TO SUPPLEMENT THE RECORD AJ PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
12/17/1990ORDER GRANT APLT'S MOT FOR LV TO FL LODGED REPLY BRIEF. MEH PANELRBH SCDATE 121390 SCHPRD VS
12/17/1990APPELLANT'S REPLY BRIEF MEH PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
12/18/1990ORDER APLT'S MOT TO SUP REC WITH RT OF GRAND JURY DATED 1/12/89 & 1/31/89 IS GRANTED & RT FILED. PANELRBH SCDATE 122090 SCHPRD OPE
12/18/1990SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD GRAND JURY PROC DATED 1/12/89 & 1/31/89. MEH PANEL SCDATE 122690 SCHPRD OPE
01/02/1991FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
01/02/1991ARGUED PANELRGSCGA SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
05/15/1991AFFIRMED JUDGMENT AF JUDGMENT OF CONVICTION PANELRGSCGA SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
05/15/1991DISP NO - 01 DISP - AF METH -OPN JUDGE -GA CITE 590 A.2d 1048
05/15/1991OPINION TYPE M JUDGE - GA PAGE # - 1348
06/06/1991MANDATE ISSUED PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD