judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

UNITED STATES V. FRED ROSS

Case Information: 89-CF-0909
Short Caption:UNITED STATES V. FRED ROSSClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Other Felony
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:F6466-88Filed Date:08/30/1989

Opening Event Date:08/30/1989Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:10/19/1989Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:12/11/1989
Argued/Submitted:
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:08/24/1990

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantUnited StatesN
Ann K. H. SimonYN
John R. Fisher YN
AppelleeFred Ross N
Page Kennedy YN
James W. KleinNY

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901UNITED STATES ROSS, FRED
01/01/1903NOTE - 01 101089 ORD: RECORD DUE IN 5 NOTE - 01 DAYS; APLE'S BRF DUE 20 DAYS NOTE - 02 THEREAFTER; FO APLT MAY W/I NOTE - 02 20 DAYS AFTER APLE'S BRF FILE NOTE - 03 SUPPLEMENT TO ITS BRIEF; CASE NOTE - 03 TO BE SCHEDULED IN DECEMBER. NOTE - 04 2/8/90 ORD: REMAND THE RECORD NOTE - 04 TO THE TRIAL COURT TO NOTE - 05 ARTICULATE ADEQUATELY THE NOTE - 05 BASIS FOR ITS DETERMINATION NOTE - 06 THAT MR. ROCK WAS INCOMPETENT NOTE - 06 TO TESTIFY.
08/30/1989FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
09/11/1989APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXPEDITE APPEAL APPEAL AND SET BRIEFING SCHEDULE JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
10/03/1989APPELLANT'S BRIEF AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
10/10/1989ORDER SEE NOTE FIELDS 01-03. MEH PANELRO SCDATE 100389 SCHPRD Q
10/11/1989APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXPEDITE APPEAL AND SET BRIEFING & ARGUMENT SCHEDULED AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
10/16/1989ORDER IN LIGHT OF 10/10/89 ORDER, DENY MO OF APLT TO EXPEDITE AS MOOT. DAS PANELRO SCDATE 102389 SCHPRD OPE
10/19/1989FiledRecord Completed
10/19/1989RECORD ON APPEAL (39 PGS/SWARINGER) AD PANEL SCDATE 101589 SCHPRD R
11/09/1989APPELLEE'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE BRIEF RJG PANEL SCDATE 110889 SCHPRD BE
11/09/1989RECEIVED APPELLEE'S BRIEF RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
11/29/1989APPELLANT'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE REPLY BRIEF AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
11/29/1989RECEIVED APPELLANT REPLY BRIEF AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
11/29/1989SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD 104 PGS-GOAD, 41 PGS-SWARINGER AND 12 PGS-SALAZAR SL PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
11/30/1989SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD (IN CAMERA -RT)(STIPULATION) GG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
12/04/1989MEMORANDUM ARGUED BEFORE JJ RG/BE/MK PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
12/11/1989FiledBriefing Completed
12/11/1989APPELEE'S BRIEF FVH. PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
12/11/1989ORDER GRANTING MLBE & MLRBA FVH PANELROBEMK SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
12/11/1989APPELLANT'S REPLY BRIEF FVH PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
02/08/1990ORDER SEE NOTE FIELDS 4 THRU 6 SL PANELROBEMK SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
07/30/1990FiledOUTCOME/DISPOSITION - Outcome-Disposition
07/30/1990ORDER REMANDING THIS CASE TO TRIAL COURT FOR PURPOSES STATED IN TRIAL CT'S 3/14/90 ORDER SL PANELROBEMK SCDATE 120489 SCHPRD RDEC
07/30/1990DISP NO - 01 DISP - RM METH -ORD JUDGE -PC CITE
08/24/1990MANDATE ISSUED PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD