judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

ROBERT B. REED V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 89-CF-0908
Short Caption:ROBERT B. REED V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Other Felony
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:F3462-89Filed Date:09/12/1989

Opening Event Date:09/12/1989Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:
Argued/Submitted:
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:10/18/1989

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantRobert B. Reed N
James W. KleinNY
AppelleeUnited StatesN
John R. Fisher NN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901REED, ROBERT B. UNITED STATES
09/12/1989FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
09/12/1989APPELLANT'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY REVERSAL APPELLANT'S RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
09/18/1989APPELLEE'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY AFFIRMANCE OF ORDER CONTINUING PROVENTIVE DETENTION (APPELLEE) JB PANEL SCDATE 091989 SCHPRD OPE
09/20/1989APPELLANT'S OPPOSITION TO MOTION FOR SUMMARY AFFIRMANCE JB PANEL SCDATE 092789 SCHPRD OPA
09/21/1989ORDER APPOINTING JAMES KLEIN, ESQ. AS COUNSEL FOR APLT. DOCKETING STATEMENT DUE IN 10 DAYS. GG PANELRO SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
09/27/1989AFFIRMED JMT DENYG MO FOR SUM REVERSAL; GRANTG MO FOR SUM AFFIRMANCE; AFFIRMING ORD ON APPEAL. CWC PANELNWBETE SCDATE 092289 SCHPRD VS
09/27/1989DISP NO - 01 DISP - AF METH -JDG JUDGE -PC CITE
10/18/1989MANDATE ISSUED PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD