judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

THERESA JOHNSON V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 88-CF-0494
Short Caption:THERESA JOHNSON V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Drug Related
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:F11731-87Filed Date:05/02/1988

Opening Event Date:05/02/1988Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:09/08/1988Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:04/14/1989
Argued/Submitted:10/12/1989
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:11/08/1989

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantTheresa Johnson N
Bill D. Burlison YN
AppelleeUnited StatesN
John R. Fisher YN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901JOHNSON, THERESA UNITED STATES
05/02/1988FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
05/12/1988APPOINTING COUNSEL/CO REFERRAL (CJA) BILL D. BURLISON, ESQ. PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
05/16/1988APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT JB PANEL SCDATE 052388 SCHPRD DSA
06/28/1988RECORD ON APPEAL GT PANEL SCDATE 070188 SCHPRD R
09/08/1988FiledRecord Completed
09/08/1988ACTION SLIP MAILED PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
09/08/1988SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #(1 15 PGS /LEWIS) AD AND #2(253 PGS/LEWIS) PANEL SCDATE 090688 SCHPRD RT
10/03/1988APPELLANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS/WITHDRAW APPEAL JB (MOTION W/DRAWN - SEE 12/7/88 ORDER - EBP) PANEL SCDATE 101888 SCHPRD BA
10/18/1988ORDER CNSL FOR APLT W/I 10 DAYS TO FILE STMT IN ACCORD. WITH JOHNSON V. U.S. SL PANELPY SCDATE 100488 SCHPRD N
10/24/1988MISCELLANEOUS PROCEDURAL MOTION OF APPELLANT TO WITHDRAW MOTION TO DISMISS APPEAL GT PANEL SCDATE 102888 SCHPRD STATE
12/07/1988ORDER GRANT APLT MO TO W/DRAW MO TO DISMISS; FO: APLT BR DUE IN 40 DAYS. EBP PANELRO SCDATE 111788 SCHPRD M
01/12/1989APPELLANT'S BRIEF JB PANEL SCDATE 011689 SCHPRD BA
02/14/1989APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO MARCH 15, 1989 RJG PANEL SCDATE 021389 SCHPRD BE
03/01/1989ORDER GRANT MO OF APLE TO EXT TM TO FL BRF TO 3/15/89. DAS PANELRBH SCDATE 022789 SCHPRD OPA
03/16/1989APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 4-14-89 AD PANEL SCDATE 031589 SCHPRD BE
03/31/1989ORDER GRANT MO OF APLE TO EXT TM TO FL BRF TO 4/14/89. DAS PANELRBH SCDATE 032889 SCHPRD OPA
04/14/1989FiledBriefing Completed
04/14/1989APPELEE'S BRIEF GT PANEL SCDATE 041489 SCHPRD BE
10/12/1989FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
10/12/1989SUBMITTED PANELNWFERY SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
10/16/1989AFFIRMED MOJ AF JUDGMENT ON APPEAL PANELNWFERY SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
10/16/1989DISP NO - 01 DISP - AF METH -MOJ JUDGE -PC CITE
11/08/1989MANDATE ISSUED RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
11/30/1989APPOINTING COUNSEL/CO REFERRAL (CJA) BILL D. BURLISON, ESQ. PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD