judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

IRENE P. WILLS V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 88-CF-0450
Short Caption:IRENE P. WILLS V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Drug Related
Lead:88-CF-0450Consolidated: 88-CF-1369
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:F13251-81Filed Date:04/18/1988

Opening Event Date:04/18/1988Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:08/31/1988Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:09/04/1990
Argued/Submitted:02/12/1991
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:03/20/1991

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantIrene P. Wills N
Mindy A. DanielsYY
AppelleeUnited StatesN
Denise M. Abrahams YN
John R. Fisher YN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901WILLS, IRENE P. UNITED STATES
01/01/1903NOTE - 01 11/9/88 ORD: GRANT MO OF APLT NOTE - 01 TO REINSTATE CASE & CONS WITH NOTE - 02 88-1369; MINDY DANIELS APPTD NOTE - 02 FOR APLT IN 88-1369; APLT TO NOTE - 03 FL DSA IN 88-1369 IN 10 DAYS. NOTE - 03 NOTE - 04 CON 88-1369 & 89-1071 NOTE - 04 NOTE - 05 5/26/89 ORD: GRT APLT'S MO TO NOTE - 05 STAY BRFG SCHD AND ALL PROC. NOTE - 06 IN THIS APPEAL ARE HEREBY NOTE - 06 STAYED PDG DISP OF THE MOTION NOTE - 07 PURSUANT TO D.C. CODE SECTION NOTE - 07 23-110 FILED IN THE TRIAL CT. NOTE - 08 FO THAT CNSL FOR APLT W/I 30 NOTE - 08 DAYS TO ADVISE THIS CT RE THE NOTE - 09 STATUS OF THE 23-110 MOTION NOTE - 09 FILED IN THE TRIAL COURT. NOTE - 10 9/1/89 ORD: 89-1071 CONS W/ NOTE - 10 PREVIOUSLY CONS 88-450 & 88- NOTE - 11 1369; MINDY DANIELS APPTD FOR NOTE - 11 APLT IN 89-1071; APLT TO FL NOTE - 12 DSA IN 89-1071 IN 10 DAYS. NOTE - 12
04/18/1988FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
04/28/1988APPOINTING COUNSEL/CO REFERRAL (CJA) MINDY A. DANIELS, ESQ. PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
05/06/1988APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT GT PANEL SCDATE 050988 SCHPRD DSA
06/09/1988RECEIVED RECVD CERTIFICATION OF 2/22 - 2/24/88 RT FROM CT RPT WHALEN- DUPLICATE ORDER. EBP PANEL SCDATE 071588 SCHPRD RT
06/14/1988RECORD ON APPEAL GT PANEL SCDATE 062088 SCHPRD R
08/04/1988SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #1 (343 PGS RT - WHALEN) GT PANEL SCDATE 081188 SCHPRD RT
08/31/1988FiledRecord Completed
08/31/1988ACTION SLIP MAILED PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
08/31/1988SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #2(6 PGS MITCHELL)AD PANEL SCDATE 081088 SCHPRD RT
09/16/1988APPELLANT'S MOTION TO REMAND TO TRIAL COURT FOR REDUCTION OF SENTENCE JB PANEL SCDATE 101288 SCHPRD BA
09/22/1988ORDER GRANT MO OF APLT TO REMAND & CASE REMANDED TO TRL CRT FOR PURPOSE OF REDUCING SENTENCE. PANELPY SCDATE 092888 SCHPRD OPE
10/14/1988MANDATE ISSUED PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
10/28/1988MISCELLANEOUS SUBSTANTIVE MOTION OF APPELLANT TO REINSTATE APPEAL AND TO CONSOLIDATE WITH APPEAL #88-1369 JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
11/09/1988ORDER SEE NOTE FIELDS 01-03. DAS PANELRO SCDATE 110988 SCHPRD OPE
11/16/1988APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT IN 88-1369 RJG PANEL SCDATE 112188 SCHPRD DSA
04/12/1989APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF UNTIL APPELLANT'S 23-110 MOTION IS DECIDED ON AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
04/17/1989RECEIVED COPY OF 23-110 MOTION FILED IN SUPERIOR COURT BY APLT'S COUNSEL RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
05/26/1989ORDER SEE NOTE FIELDS 5 THRU 9 SL PANELRO SCDATE 050389 SCHPRD N
06/26/1989STATEMENT OF APPELLANT REGARDING STATUS OF 23-110 MOTION FILED IN THE TRIAL COURT JB PANEL SCDATE 062689 SCHPRD STATE
07/24/1989STATEMENT OF APPELLANT PER ORDER 5/26/89 MLR PANEL SCDATE 080189 SCHPRD CHECK
09/01/1989ORDER SEE NOTE FIELDS 10-12. DAS PANELRO SCDATE 081789 SCHPRD X
09/11/1989APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT IN 89-1071 JB PANEL SCDATE 091189 SCHPRD DSA
04/25/1990SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #1 (99-PGS/MITCHELL) IN 89-1071 PANEL SCDATE 012890 SCHPRD RT
04/26/1990ACTION SLIP MAILED AJ PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
06/06/1990APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO JULY 5, 1990 (NO OPPO) AJ PANEL SCDATE 060590 SCHPRD BA
06/18/1990ORDER GRT APLT MO X TM TO FL BRIEF TO 7/5/90. NFX JJ PANELDJDW SCDATE 061190 SCHPRD B
07/11/1990APPELLANT'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE BRIEF RJG PANEL SCDATE 070590 SCHPRD BA
07/11/1990RECEIVED APPELLANT'S BRIEF RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
08/02/1990APPELLANT'S BRIEF JJ PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
08/02/1990ORDER GRT APLT MO LV TO FL LODGED BRF; APLE BRF IN 30 DAYS. JJ PANELRBH SCDATE 072790 SCHPRD B
09/04/1990FiledBriefing Completed
09/04/1990APPELEE'S BRIEF AD PANEL SCDATE 090490 SCHPRD BE
02/12/1991SUBMITTED PANELSTWGRY SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
02/27/1991AFFIRMED MOJ AF JUDGMENT ON APPEAL PANELSTWGRY SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
02/27/1991DISP NO - 01 DISP - AF METH -MOJ JUDGE -PC CITE
03/20/1991MANDATE ISSUED PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD