Case Information: 10-CV-0866 | |||
Short Caption: | CAFRITZ COMPANY V. JOHN SCHERLIS | Classification: | Appeals - Civil - Landlord And Tenant |
Lead: | 10-CV-0814 | Consolidated: | 10-CV-0866 |
Superior Court or Agency Case Number: | LTB19938-05 | Filed Date: | 07/12/2010 |
| |||
Opening Event Date: | 07/12/2010 | Case Status: | Closed |
Record Completed: | Post-Decision Matter Pending: | ||
Briefs Completed: | |||
Argued/Submitted: | |||
Disposition: | Next Scheduled Action: | ||
Mandate Issued: | 09/30/2010 |
Party Information | |||||||||
Appellate Role | Party Name | IFP | Attorney(s) | Arguing Attorney | E-Filer | ||||
Appellant | Cafritz Company | N |
| ||||||
Appellee | John Scherlis | N |
|
Events | ||||
Event Date | Status | Description | Result | |
07/12/2010 | NOTICE OF APPEAL | |||
08/04/2010 | APPELLANT'S MOTION TO CONSOLIDATE w/10-CV-814 and to stay appeal pending Sup Crt ruling on aplt mot for summary judgment. | |||
08/11/2010 | APPELLEE'S ANSWER/RESPONSE- to aplt's motion to consolidate appeals and to stay appeals pending ruling on defendants' motion for summary judgement | |||
09/01/2010 | APPELLEE'S MISCELLANEOUS PROCEDURAL MOTION for leave to file memorandum on the issue of whether the court has juridiction to entertain appeals | |||
09/01/2010 | RECEIVED-aple's memorandum on the isue of whether the court has jurisdiction to entertain appeals | |||
09/09/2010 | ORDERED, that the AUGUST 2, 2010 OTSC IS HEREBY DISCHARGED. It is ****MORE***** | |||
09/09/2010 | FURTHER ORDERED that the MOTION TO CONSOLIDATE IS GRANTED and APPEAL NOS 10CV814 & 10CV866 are hereby CONSOLIDATED for all purposes. It is *****MORE**** | |||
09/09/2010 | FURTHER ORDERED that APPELLEES' MOTION FOR LEAVE IS GRANTED and the Clerk shal file the lodged memorandum. It is *****MORE***** | |||
09/09/2010 | MISCELLANEOUS-APPELLEES' MEMO ON THE ISSUES WHETHER THE COURT HAS JURISDICTION | |||
09/09/2010 | FURTHER ORDERED, SS, that THESE APPEALS ARE REMANDED TO THE TRIAL COURT for further action and upon entry of an order that resolves all matters in the consolidation, if any party remains aggrieved, they may file a NOA. It is *****MORE***** | |||
09/09/2010 | FURTHER ORDERED that APPELLANT'S MOTION TO STAY IS DENIED AS MOOT. (BY: ETW) lw | |||
09/13/2010 | RECEIVED - aplt's reponse to motion to file memorandum on the issue of whether the Court has jurisdiction to entertain appeals. | |||
09/30/2010 | MANDATE ISSUED | |||
10/01/2010 | RECEIVED - aplt's response to Show Cause ord (sent next day air 8/20/10--not recvd by DCCA until 10/1/10) | |||
04/18/2014 | Filed | Archived | ||
08/30/2030 | error |