judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

LEON WILLIFORD V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 88-CF-0491
Short Caption:LEON WILLIFORD V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Robbery Related
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:F9361-86Filed Date:04/29/1988

Opening Event Date:04/29/1988Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:09/18/1990Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:12/31/1990
Argued/Submitted:04/16/1991
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:05/10/1991

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantLeon Williford N
William S. Rhyne YN
AppelleeUnited StatesN
John R. Fisher YN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901WILLIFORD, LEON UNITED STATES
01/01/1905TRDATE- 91/04/16 ACTION - ARG ATTY 1 - RHYNEW FOR - APPELLANT ATTY 2 - CARWILEPK FOR - APPELLEE
04/29/1988FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
05/12/1988APPOINTING COUNSEL/CO REFERRAL (CJA) WILLIAM S. RHYNE, ESQ. PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
05/23/1988APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT RJG PANEL SCDATE 052388 SCHPRD DSA
06/24/1988RECORD ON APPEAL (RTC) JB PANEL SCDATE 062888 SCHPRD R
07/22/1988ORDER CT RPTR TO COMPLETE & FILE RT OF 1/27/88 TR PROC BY 1/30/89 ABSO-NFX. EBP PANELPY SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
08/09/1988SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #1 (42 PGS - SCHOCH) JB PANEL SCDATE 063088 SCHPRD RT
01/27/1989SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #2 (156 PGS RT - MOORE) GT PANEL SCDATE 013089 SCHPRD RT
02/13/1989SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #3(332 PGS/FRANKLIN) AD PANEL SCDATE 103189 SCHPRD RT
09/18/1990FiledRecord Completed
09/18/1990ORDER BRIEF OF APPELLANT SHALL BE FILED W/IN 40 DAYS FROM ORDER (REC COMPLETE) JB PANELFF SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
10/26/1990APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO NOVEMBER 26, 1990 (NO OPPO) RJG PANEL SCDATE 102990 SCHPRD BA
11/06/1990ORDER GRNT APLT MO X TM TO FL BRF TO 11-26-90. NFX GR PANELRBH SCDATE 110190 SCHPRD GR
11/26/1990APPELLANT'S BRIEF RJG PANEL SCDATE 112690 SCHPRD BA
12/31/1990FiledBriefing Completed
12/31/1990APPELEE'S BRIEF GG PANEL SCDATE 010291 SCHPRD BE
03/11/1991APPELLANT'S MOTION REQUESTING ORAL ARGUMENT AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
03/14/1991SUMMARY I CALENDAR GRANT APLT'S 3/11/91 RQST TO PRESENT ORAL ARGUMENT. CT. PANELRBH SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
04/16/1991FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
04/16/1991ARGUED PANELFETEMK SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
04/19/1991AFFIRMED MOJ AF JUDGMENT ON APPEAL PANELFETEMK SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
04/19/1991DISP NO - 01 DISP - AF METH -MOJ JUDGE -PC CITE
05/10/1991MANDATE ISSUED PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD