judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

CORTEZ G. ASHTON V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 88-CF-0492
Short Caption:CORTEZ G. ASHTON V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Drug Related
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:F8114-87Filed Date:05/02/1988

Opening Event Date:05/02/1988Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:06/03/1988Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:
Argued/Submitted:
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:08/16/1989

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantCortez G. Ashton N
Bruce B. Mchale NN
AppelleeUnited StatesN
John R. Fisher NN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901ASHTON, CORTEZ G. UNITED STATES
01/01/1903NOTE - 01 5/27/88 ORD: GRANT MO OF APLT NOTE - 01 TO PROCEED IN F/P & APPT BRUCE NOTE - 02 MCHALE FOR APLT; APLT TO FL NOTE - 02 DSA IN 10 DAYS; CLK OF SUPER NOTE - 03 CRT TO TRANSMIT RECORD W/OUT NOTE - 03 FEE FORTHWITH.
05/02/1988FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
05/17/1988APPELLANT'S MOTION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS OF APPELLANT, PRO SE, & REQ. FOR APT. OF COUNSEL RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
05/27/1988APPOINTING COUNSEL/CO REFERRAL (CJA) BRUCE McHALE, ESQ. PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
05/27/1988ORDER SEE NOTE FIELDS 01-03. DAS PANELPY SCDATE 051888 SCHPRD Q
06/03/1988FiledRecord Completed
06/03/1988ACTION SLIP MAILED JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
06/03/1988RECORD ON APPEAL JB PANEL SCDATE 070188 SCHPRD R
06/06/1988APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT GT PANEL SCDATE 060788 SCHPRD DSA
06/20/1988APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF UNTIL FORTY (40) DAYS AFTER COMPLETE TRANSCRIPT IS FILED GT PANEL SCDATE 071388 SCHPRD BA
07/01/1988ORDER GRANT APLT MO FOR EXT TO FILE BR TO 40 DAYS AFT RT IS FILED W/THIS COURT. EBP PANELPY SCDATE 062488 SCHPRD M
09/30/1988RECEIVED LETTER DATED 9/28/88 FROM AP- PELLANT, PRO SE, RE TRANSCRIPT MLR PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
12/29/1988SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #1(16 PGS/WATKINS) AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
02/15/1989SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #2(12 PGS/MILLER) AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
03/07/1989SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD (11 PGS/SCHERTZER) AD PANEL SCDATE 070289 SCHPRD RT
03/20/1989SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #4(13 PGS/BURNEY) AD PANEL SCDATE 063089 SCHPRD RT
05/04/1989LETTER TO APLT IN RESPONSE TO HIS LTR OF 4/18/89 SL PANELDDW SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
05/05/1989ORDER THAT APLT'S BRF SHALL BE FILED W/I 40 DAYS FROM DATE OF THIS ORDER SL PANELRBH SCDATE 070189 SCHPRD RT
06/14/1989APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 7-15-89 AD PANEL SCDATE 061489 SCHPRD BA
07/06/1989ORDER GRANT MO OF APLT TO EXT TM TO FL BRF TO 7/15/89. DAS PANELRBH SCDATE 062689 SCHPRD OPE
07/13/1989STIPULATION TO DISMISS APPEAL AD PANEL SCDATE 071589 SCHPRD BA
07/24/1989FiledOUTCOME/DISPOSITION - Outcome-Disposition
07/24/1989ORDER APPEAL DISMISSED. PB PANELRO SCDATE 071489 SCHPRD Q
07/24/1989DISP NO - 01 DISP - DS METH -ORD JUDGE -RO CITE
08/16/1989MANDATE ISSUED PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD