judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

ORLANDO X. BELL V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 89-CF-0978
Short Caption:ORLANDO X. BELL V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Other Felony
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:F12937-88Filed Date:08/08/1989

Opening Event Date:08/08/1989Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:09/12/1989Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:
Argued/Submitted:
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:01/03/1990

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantOrlando X. Bell N
John A. Briley, Jr.NN
AppelleeUnited StatesN
John R. Fisher NN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901BELL, ORLANDO X. UNITED STATES
08/08/1989FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
08/10/1989APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
08/24/1989APPOINTING COUNSEL/CO REFERRAL (CJA) JOHN A. BRILEY, JR., ESQ. PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
09/12/1989FiledRecord Completed
09/12/1989ACTION SLIP MAILED GT PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
09/12/1989RECORD ON APPEAL GT PANEL SCDATE 100989 SCHPRD R
10/04/1989SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #1 (23 PGS RT - SALAZAR) GT PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
11/30/1989APPELLEE'S MOTION TO REMAND AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
12/13/1989FiledOUTCOME/DISPOSITION - Outcome-Disposition
12/13/1989ORDER GRANTING APLE'S MOTION TO REMAND CASE TO TRIAL COURT. FVH PANELRO SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
12/13/1989DISP NO - 01 DISP - RM METH -ORD JUDGE -RO CITE
12/19/1989RECEIVED SR#2(15 PGS/MILLER) AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
01/03/1990MANDATE ISSUED PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD