judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

DWAYNE F. EARL V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 88-CF-0477
Short Caption:DWAYNE F. EARL V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Drug Related
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:F9119-87Filed Date:04/20/1988

Opening Event Date:04/20/1988Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:12/29/1988Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:07/19/1989
Argued/Submitted:12/14/1989
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:01/08/1990

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantDwayne F. Earl N
G. Godwin Oyewole NN
AppellantJohn Doe N
Richard S. Bromberg YN
AppelleeUnited StatesN
John R. Fisher YN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901EARL, DWAYNE F. UNITED STATES
01/01/1903NOTE - 01 10/3/88 ORD: GRT CNSL'S MO TO NOTE - 01 WITHDRAW AND THE APPTMT OF NOTE - 02 G. GODWIN OYEWOLE, ESQ., IS NOTE - 02 HEREBY VACATED AND THE CLK IS NOTE - 03 DIRTD TO ENTER THE APPR OF NOTE - 03 RICHARD S. BROMBERG, ESQ., AS NOTE - 04 CNSL TO REPRESENT APLT ON THIS NOTE - 04 APPEAL. FO THAT APLT'S BRIEF NOTE - 05 SHALL BE FILED 40 DAYS AFTER NOTE - 05 THE TRANSCRIPT IS FILED WITH NOTE - 06 THIS COURT. NOTE - 06
01/01/1906 OYEWOLEG VACATED PER 10/3/88 ORDER
04/20/1988FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
05/12/1988APPOINTING COUNSEL/CO REFERRAL (CJA) G. GODWIN OYEWOLE, ESQ. PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
05/18/1988APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT RJG PANEL SCDATE 052388 SCHPRD DSA
06/21/1988RECORD ON APPEAL GT PANEL SCDATE 062088 SCHPRD R
08/15/1988APPEARANCE OF RICHARD S. BROMBERG AS COUNSEL FOR APPELLANT JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
09/19/1988COUNSEL'S MOTION TO WITHDRAW FOR BUSINESS REASONS OF G. GODWIN OYEWOLE AS COUNSEL FOR APPELLANT JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
10/03/1988ORDER SEE NOTE FIELDS 1 THRU 6 SL PANELPY SCDATE 092688 SCHPRD N
12/29/1988FiledRecord Completed
12/29/1988ACTION SLIP MAILED AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
12/29/1988SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #1(286 PGS/JACKSON) AD PANEL SCDATE 113088 SCHPRD RT
01/27/1989APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO MARCH 20TH (NO OPPO) JB PANEL SCDATE 020789 SCHPRD BA
02/09/1989DESIGNATION OF RECORD (SUPPLEMENTAL) JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
02/14/1989ORDER GRT APLT MO FO EXT OF TM TO FL BRF TO 3/20/89. PB PANELRBH SCDATE 020689 SCHPRD CHECK
02/27/1989SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #2(EXHIBIT RELEASE FORM) AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
03/17/1989APPELLANT'S BRIEF AD PANEL SCDATE 032089 SCHPRD BA
04/20/1989APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 5-19-89 AD PANEL SCDATE 042189 SCHPRD BE
05/05/1989ORDER GRANT MO OF APLE TO EXT TM TO FL BRF TO 5/19/89. DAS PANELRBH SCDATE 050289 SCHPRD OPA
05/23/1989APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 6-19-89 AD PANEL SCDATE 051989 SCHPRD BE
06/12/1989ORDER GRANT APLE MO TO EXT TM TO FL BRF TO 6/19/89; NFX. MEH PANELRBH SCDATE 060889 SCHPRD M
06/19/1989APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 7-19-89 AD PANEL SCDATE 061989 SCHPRD BE
07/17/1989ORDER GRANT APLE MO TO EXT TM TO FL BRF TO 7/19/89. MEH PANELRBH SCDATE 071189 SCHPRD Q
07/19/1989FiledBriefing Completed
07/19/1989APPELEE'S BRIEF AD PANEL SCDATE 071989 SCHPRD BE
12/14/1989FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
12/14/1989SUBMITTED PANELTESCMK SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
12/18/1989AFFIRMED MOJ AF JUDGMENT APPEALED FROM PANELTESCMK SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
12/18/1989DISP NO - 01 DISP - AF METH -MOJ JUDGE -PC CITE
01/08/1990MANDATE ISSUED PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD