judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

OWEN WHITE V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 89-CF-1010
Short Caption:OWEN WHITE V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Drug Related
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:F1772-88Filed Date:08/09/1989

Opening Event Date:08/09/1989Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:01/18/1990Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:09/03/1991
Argued/Submitted:11/06/1991
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:08/19/1992

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantOwen White N
B. Milile Archibald YN
AppelleeUnited StatesN
John R. Fisher NN
Kristan L. PetersNN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901WHITE, OWEN UNITED STATES
01/01/1902
01/01/1903NOTE - 01 SEE 89-393 AND 85-878 NOTE - 01 NOTE - 02 10/3/89 ORD: GRANT F/P MO OF NOTE - 02 APLT & B. MILELE ARCHIBALD NOTE - 03 APPTD FOR APLT; APLT TO FL DSA NOTE - 03 IN 10 DAYS; BRF OF APLT DUE IN NOTE - 04 40 DAYS. NOTE - 04 NOTE - 05 5/2/91 ORD. BA DUE 7/16, BE NOTE - 05 DUE 8/20, RBA DUE 9/9, NFX; NOTE - 06 TO BE SCHD ON NOVEMBER CAL. NOTE - 06 NOTE - 07 8/27/91 ORD: BRF OF APLE DUE NOTE - 07 BY 9/3/91 & REPLY BRF OF APLT, NOTE - 08 IF ANY, DUE BY 9/23/91; CASE NOTE - 08 TO REMAIN SCHED ON NOV CAL NOTE - 09 CON: 89-484 NOTE - 09
08/09/1989NOTICE OF APPEAL
08/23/1989LETTER REQUESTING APLT TO FILE FORM 5 AFF & REQUEST FOR APPOINTMENT OF COUNSEL. GG PANELDDW SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
09/01/1989RECORD ON APPEAL AD PANEL SCDATE 101089 SCHPRD R
09/15/1989APPELLANT'S MOTION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS APLT AD PANEL SCDATE 092289 SCHPRD ANSA
10/03/1989APPOINTING COUNSEL/CO REFERRAL (CJA) B. MILELE ARCHIBALD, ESQ. PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
10/03/1989ORDER SEE NOTE FIELDS 02-04. DAS PANEL SCDATE 091389 SCHPRD CHECK
10/05/1989SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #1 (245 PGS - SALAZAR) JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
10/13/1989APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT AD PANEL SCDATE 101389 SCHPRD DSA
10/20/1989APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 40 DAYS AFTER COMPLETION OF TRANSCRIPTS RJG PANEL SCDATE 111389 SCHPRD BA
11/16/1989ORDER GRANT APLT MO FOR EXT TO FILE BR; APLT BR DUE W/IN 40 DAYS AFTER RT FILED JB PANELRBH SCDATE 102389 SCHPRD U
12/29/1989RECEIVED REPORTER'S CERTIFICATION FROM FARMER - 1/17/89 - 1/19/89 PROC (DUP REQUEST) JB PANEL SCDATE 040590 SCHPRD RT
01/17/1990SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #2(111 PGS/PAVLISH) AD PANEL SCDATE 012890 SCHPRD RT
01/18/1990SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #2 (47 PGS. -- FARMER) RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
01/18/1990SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD (12 PGS/BURNEY) AD PANEL SCDATE 040691 SCHPRD RT
01/18/1990RECORD COMPLETED
05/02/1991ORDER SEE NOTE FIELDS 5-6. AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
07/22/1991ORDER BRF OF APLT DUE IN 5 DAYS OR APMT VACATED. EVH PANELRBH SCDATE 071891 SCHPRD V
07/29/1991APPELLANT'S BRIEF AJ PANEL SCDATE 072991 SCHPRD BA
08/27/1991ORDER SEE NOTE FIELDS 7 & 8. DAS PANELRBH SCDATE 082091 SCHPRD BE
09/03/1991APPELEE'S BRIEF PMB PANEL SCDATE 090391 SCHPRD BE
09/03/1991BRIEFS COMPLETED
09/23/1991APPELLANT'S REPLY BRIEF RJG PANEL SCDATE 092391 SCHPRD RBA
11/06/1991FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
11/06/1991ORDER SS ORDER THIS CASE & 89-484 ARE CONSOLIDATED FOR ALL PUR- POSES. MEH PANELROFEMK SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
11/06/1991SUBMITTED PANELRGFEMK SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
07/28/1992AFFIRMED Judgment AF judgment of conviction (RG FE MK)
08/19/1992MANDATE ISSUED
10/02/1992RECEIVED copy of appellant's pro se Motion for Leave to File Petition for a Writ of Certiorari filed in the U.S. Supreme Court.