judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

RAYMOND E. WELDON V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 89-CF-1011
Short Caption:RAYMOND E. WELDON V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Other Felony
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:F335-89Filed Date:08/09/1989

Opening Event Date:08/09/1989Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:11/11/1989Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:08/15/1990
Argued/Submitted:12/19/1990
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:01/18/1991

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantRaymond E. Weldon N
Joseph O. Pellington NN
AppellantJohn Doe N
Walter S. BoothYN
AppelleeUnited StatesN
David A. Payne YN
John R. Fisher YN
AppelleeJohn Doe N
John R. Fisher NN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901WELDON, RAYMOND E. UNITED STATES
01/01/1903NOTE - 01 CODEF: ROBERT C. YOUNG NOTE - 01 NOTE - 02 01/19/90 ORD: ESQ., APPTD TO NOTE - 02 REPRESENT APLT; DSA DUE W/IN NOTE - 03 10 DAYS. NOTE - 03
01/01/1906 PELLINGTONJ SS VACATED 1/19/90
08/09/1989FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
08/28/1989APPOINTING COUNSEL/CO REFERRAL (CJA) JOSEPH O. PELLINGTON, ESQ. PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
10/05/1989RECORD ON APPEAL JB PANEL SCDATE 100989 SCHPRD R
11/11/1989FiledRecord Completed
01/19/1990APPOINTING COUNSEL/CO REFERRAL (CJA) WALTER S. BOOTH, ESQ. PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
01/19/1990ORDER SS VACATING APPTMT OF JOSEPH O PELLINGTON, ESQ; FO WALTER S. BOOTH (SEE NOTE FIELDS 2&3) FH PANELRO SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
01/25/1990APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT AD PANEL SCDATE 012990 SCHPRD DSA
02/13/1990SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #1 (109-PGS/WRAY) AJ PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
02/21/1990SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #2(270 PGS/RAMOS) AD PANEL SCDATE 012990 SCHPRD RT
04/17/1990ACTION SLIP MAILED AJ PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
05/22/1990APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 6-28-90 AD PANEL SCDATE 052990 SCHPRD BA
05/29/1990ORDER GRANT APLT'S MO X TM TO FILE BRF TO 06-28-90. NFX GR PANELRBH SCDATE 052490 SCHPRD Q
06/15/1990APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 7-30-90 NO OPPO AD PANEL SCDATE 062890 SCHPRD BA
06/27/1990ORDER GRNT APLT MO X TM TO EXTENT BF SHALL BE FLD W/IN 20 DAYS FROM DATE OF THIS ORD. NFX GR PANELRBH SCDATE 062190 SCHPRD GR
07/17/1990APPELLANT'S BRIEF PF PANEL SCDATE 071790 SCHPRD BA
08/15/1990FiledBriefing Completed
08/15/1990APPELEE'S BRIEF AD PANEL SCDATE 082190 SCHPRD BE
12/19/1990FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
12/19/1990SUBMITTED RJG PANELBESTPY SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
12/27/1990AFFIRMED MOJ AFFIRMING JUDGEMENT ON APPEAL RJG PANELBESTPY SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
12/27/1990DISP NO - 01 DISP - AF METH -MOJ JUDGE -PC CITE
01/18/1991MANDATE ISSUED PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD