judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

DARREN CUNNINGHAM V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 88-CF-0485
Short Caption:DARREN CUNNINGHAM V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Drug Related
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:F12408-87Filed Date:04/22/1988

Opening Event Date:04/22/1988Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:08/24/1988Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:
Argued/Submitted:
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:11/08/1988

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantDarren Cunningham N
Daniel M. Schember NN
AppelleeUnited StatesN
John R. Fisher NN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901CUNNINGHAM, DARREN UNITED STATES
04/22/1988FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
05/12/1988APPOINTING COUNSEL/CO REFERRAL (CJA) DANIEL M. SCHEMBER, ESQ. PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
05/20/1988APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT GT PANEL SCDATE 052388 SCHPRD DSA
06/21/1988RECORD ON APPEAL GT PANEL SCDATE 062188 SCHPRD R
06/27/1988ACTION SLIP MAILED GT PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
07/21/1988APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF UNTIL TRANSCRIPT IS FILED GT PANEL SCDATE 080888 SCHPRD BA
08/16/1988ORDER GRANT APLT MO FOR EXT TO FILE BR TO 40 DAYS AFT RT IS FILED W/THIS COURT. EBP PANELPY SCDATE 072988 SCHPRD OPE
08/24/1988FiledRecord Completed
08/24/1988SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #1 (237 PGS BREMEN) PANEL SCDATE 083088 SCHPRD RT
08/26/1988ACTION SLIP MAILED AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
10/05/1988APPELLANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS/WITHDRAW APPEAL MLR PANEL SCDATE 100588 SCHPRD BA
10/17/1988FiledOUTCOME/DISPOSITION - Outcome-Disposition
10/17/1988ORDER APPEAL DISMISSED. PB PANELPY SCDATE 101288 SCHPRD V
10/17/1988DISP NO - 01 DISP - DS METH -ORD JUDGE -PY CITE
11/08/1988MANDATE ISSUED PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD