judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

ANDRE L. HUBBARD V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 88-CF-0483
Short Caption:ANDRE L. HUBBARD V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Drug Related
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:F14380-87Filed Date:04/25/1988

Opening Event Date:04/25/1988Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:02/10/1989Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:07/17/1989
Argued/Submitted:12/14/1989
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantAndre L. Hubbard N
Michael L. SpekterYY
AppelleeUnited StatesN
John R. Fisher YN
Patricia L. Petty YN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901HUBBARD, ANDRE L. AKA JAMES CLARK UNITED STATES
04/25/1988FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
05/12/1988APPOINTING COUNSEL/CO REFERRAL (CJA) MICHAEL L. SPEKTER, ESQ. PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
05/23/1988APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT MLH PANEL SCDATE 052388 SCHPRD DSA
06/21/1988RECORD ON APPEAL GT PANEL SCDATE 062488 SCHPRD R
02/10/1989FiledRecord Completed
02/10/1989SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #1 (222 PGS. -- FRANKLIN) RJG PANEL SCDATE 093088 SCHPRD RT
02/14/1989ACTION SLIP MAILED RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
03/31/1989ORDER DIRG APLT, ON OR BEF 4/17/89 TO FL BA OR SHOW CAUSE WHY APT SHOULD NOT BE VACATED. FVH PANELRO SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
04/13/1989APPELLANT'S BRIEF RJG PANEL SCDATE 041789 SCHPRD BA
05/17/1989APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 6-16-89 AD PANEL SCDATE 051789 SCHPRD BE
06/09/1989ORDER GRANT MO OF APLE TO EXT TM TO FL BRF TO 6/16/89. DAS PANELRBH SCDATE 053089 SCHPRD OPA
06/16/1989APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 7-17-89 AD PANEL SCDATE 061689 SCHPRD BE
07/06/1989ORDER GRANT MO OF APLE TO EXT TM TO FL BRF TO 7/17/89; NFX. DAS PANELRBH SCDATE 062889 SCHPRD OPA
07/17/1989FiledBriefing Completed
07/17/1989APPELEE'S BRIEF GT PANEL SCDATE 071789 SCHPRD BE
11/30/1989APPELLEE'S MOTION TO REMAND AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
12/14/1989FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
12/14/1989SUBMITTED PANELTESCMK SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
12/28/1989FiledOUTCOME/DISPOSITION - Outcome-Disposition
12/28/1989ORDER GRANT APLE'S MO TO VACATE CON- VICTION & REMAND CASE TO TRIAL COURT. MEH PANELTESCMK SCDATE 113089 SCHPRD VS
12/28/1989DISP NO - 01 DISP - RM METH -ORD JUDGE -PC CITE