judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

MICHAEL A. FEASTER V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 89-CF-1000
Short Caption:MICHAEL A. FEASTER V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Sexual Abuse
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:F3313-89Filed Date:08/16/1989

Opening Event Date:08/16/1989Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:
Argued/Submitted:
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:11/03/1989

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantMichael A. Feaster N
K. Duff Lewis NN
AppelleeUnited StatesN
John R. Fisher NN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901FEASTER, MICHAEL UNITED STATES
08/16/1989FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
08/16/1989APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
08/16/1989APPELLANT'S MOTION FOR STAY (EMERGENCY) RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
08/17/1989APPELLEE'S MOTION TO DISMISS/WITHDRAW APPEAL & OPPOSITION TO EMERGENCY MOTION FOR STAY RJG PANEL SCDATE 082389 SCHPRD OPE
08/17/1989ORDER DENY MO OF APLT FOR STAY; CLK OF SUPER CRT TO PREPARE & TRANSMIT REC FORTHWITH. DAS PANELFETEST SCDATE 081689 SCHPRD TMC
08/23/1989RECORD ON APPEAL GT PANEL SCDATE 091889 SCHPRD R
08/29/1989ORDER APLT TO SHOW CAUSE IN 10 WHY CASE SHLD NOT BE DISMISSED FOR LACK OF JURISDICTION. DAS PANELFETEST SCDATE 082189 SCHPRD CHECK
10/12/1989FiledOUTCOME/DISPOSITION - Outcome-Disposition
10/12/1989ORDER DISMISSING CASE FOR LACK OF JURISDICTION. CWC PANELFETEST SCDATE 100389 SCHPRD VS
10/12/1989DISP NO - 01 DISP - DS METH -ORD JUDGE -PC CITE
11/03/1989MANDATE ISSUED PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
02/03/1993SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #10 (ORDER/JUDGE R. URBINA DATED 2/1/93).