judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

DONALD DASH V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 89-CF-0998
Short Caption:DONALD DASH V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Drug Related
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:F795-88Filed Date:07/10/1989

Opening Event Date:07/10/1989Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:01/22/1990Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:06/12/1990
Argued/Submitted:10/30/1990
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:11/26/1990

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantDonald Dash N
AppelleeUnited StatesN
John R. Fisher YN
Glenn F. IveyYY

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901DASH, DONALD UNITED STATES
01/01/1903NOTE - 01 6/12/90 ORD: GRT APLE MO X TM NOTE - 01 TO FL LODGED BRF; FO THAT THIS NOTE - 02 APPEAL SHALL BE SCHEDULED FOR NOTE - 02 CONSIDERATION BEFORE A MERITS NOTE - 03 DIVISION AS SOON AS THE NOTE - 03 CALENDAR PERMITS.
07/10/1989FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
08/16/1989RECORD ON APPEAL (122 PGS - RONAN) JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
08/28/1989APPOINTING COUNSEL/CO REFERRAL (CJA) MICHAEL J. DOWD, JR., ESQ. PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
09/12/1989APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT RJG PANEL SCDATE 091289 SCHPRD DSA
01/18/1990SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #1 (110-PGS/GRAYBILL) AJ PANEL SCDATE 122389 SCHPRD RT
01/22/1990FiledRecord Completed
01/22/1990ACTION SLIP MAILED AJ PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
03/01/1990APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO APRIL 2, 1990 (NO OPPO) AJ PANEL SCDATE 022790 SCHPRD BA
03/15/1990ORDER EXTG TIME FOR FILING APLT'S BR UP TO AND INCLUDING 4/2/90. NFX. FVH PANELRBH SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
04/02/1990APPELLANT'S BRIEF AJ PANEL SCDATE 040290 SCHPRD BA
05/04/1990APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 5-31-90 NO OPPO AD PANEL SCDATE 050790 SCHPRD BE
05/22/1990RECEIVED APPELLEE'S BRIEF (MXBE STILL PENDING) RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
06/12/1990FiledBriefing Completed
06/12/1990APPELEE'S BRIEF JJ PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
06/12/1990ORDER SEE NOTE FIELDS 1 THRU 3. JJ PANELRBH SCDATE 050890 SCHPRD B
10/30/1990FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
10/30/1990SUBMITTED RJG PANELBESWKN SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
10/31/1990AFFIRMED MOJ AFFIRMING JUDGEMENT ON APPEAL RJG PANELBESWKN SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
10/31/1990DISP NO - 01 DISP - AF METH -MOJ JUDGE -PC CITE
11/26/1990MANDATE ISSUED PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD