judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

JOSEPH HOUSTON V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 88-CF-0493
Short Caption:JOSEPH HOUSTON V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Drug Related
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:F784-88Filed Date:05/02/1988

Opening Event Date:05/02/1988Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:07/25/1989Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:08/16/1990
Argued/Submitted:05/23/1991
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:07/11/1991

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantJoseph Houston N
Veronice A. HoltYY
AppelleeUnited StatesN
Andrew S. LevetownYY
John R. Fisher YN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901HOUSTON, JOSEPH UNITED STATES
01/01/1903NOTE - 01 CODEF: FRANKLIN H. CORLEY NOTE - 01
01/01/1905TRDATE- 91/05/23 ACTION - ARG ATTY 1 - HOLTV FOR - APPELLANT ATTY 2 - LEVETOWNA FOR - APPELLEE
05/02/1988FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
05/12/1988APPOINTING COUNSEL/CO REFERRAL (CJA) VERONICE A. HOLT, ESQ. PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
05/20/1988APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT JB PANEL SCDATE 052388 SCHPRD DSA
06/28/1988RECORD ON APPEAL GT PANEL SCDATE 070188 SCHPRD R
07/27/1988SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #1 (6 PGS RT - DAVIS) GT PANEL SCDATE 070588 SCHPRD RT
07/25/1989FiledRecord Completed
07/25/1989ACTION SLIP MAILED JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
07/25/1989SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #2 (15 PGS - JANIFER) JB PANEL SCDATE 063089 SCHPRD RT
10/04/1989ORDER COUNSEL FOR APLT TO FL BRF IN 10 DAYS OR REFERRED TO BPR DAS PANELRBH SCDATE 090489 SCHPRD BA
10/11/1989MISCELLANEOUS PROCEDURAL MOTION OF APPELLANT TO VACATE ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE AND ORDER BRIEFING SCHEDULE JB PANEL SCDATE 101689 SCHPRD BA
10/31/1989ORDER GRANT APLT MO TO VACATE TO THE EXTENT APLT'S BRF DUE IN 40 DAYS. MEH PANELRBH SCDATE 102689 SCHPRD M
01/12/1990APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 2-16-90 AD PANEL SCDATE 121089 SCHPRD BA
02/14/1990ORDER EXTG TIME FOR FILING APLT'S BR TO AND INCLUDING 2/16/90. NFX FVH PANELRBH SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
04/17/1990ORDER COUNSEL FOR APLT TO FL BA IN 10 DAYS OR REFER TO BPR. DAS PANELRO SCDATE 021690 SCHPRD BA
04/26/1990APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO JUNE 30, 1990 AJ PANEL SCDATE 042790 SCHPRD BA
06/08/1990ORDER GRANTG APLT'S MO TO EXT TM TO FILE BRIEF TO 6/30/90; NFX. CWC PANELRBH SCDATE 051490 SCHPRD TO
07/12/1990ORDER APLT'S BRIEF DUE IN 10 DAYS OR APPT OF COUNSEL TO BE VACATED & MATTER REFERRED TO BPR. CWC PANELRO SCDATE 070390 SCHPRD TO
07/17/1990APPELLANT'S BRIEF AD PANEL SCDATE 072390 SCHPRD BA
07/17/1990RECEIVED MO FOR LEAVE TO LATE FILE BRIEF --NO NEEDED AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
08/16/1990FiledBriefing Completed
08/16/1990APPELEE'S BRIEF AD PANEL SCDATE 082190 SCHPRD BE
05/23/1991FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
05/23/1991ARGUED PANELRGFETE SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
06/19/1991VACATED IN PART/REMANDED IN PART JUDGMENT VA APLT'S SENTENCE/ CAUSE RM FOR RESENTENCING CONSISTENT w/OPINION FILED PANELRGFETE SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
06/19/1991DISP NO - 01 DISP - VARM METH -OPN JUDGE -TE CITE 592 A.2d 1066
06/19/1991OPINION TYPE M JUDGE - TE PAGE # - 1777
07/11/1991MANDATE ISSUED PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD