judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

HAROLD GREEN, JR. V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 89-CF-0946
Short Caption:HAROLD GREEN, JR. V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Drug Related
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:F5187-87Filed Date:09/13/1989

Opening Event Date:09/13/1989Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:03/08/1990Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:10/07/1991
Argued/Submitted:03/09/1992
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:04/17/1992

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantHarold Green, Jr.N
Steven Weinberg YN
AppelleeUnited StatesN
John R. Fisher YN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901GREEN JR., HAROLD UNITED STATES
01/01/1902SUMMARY II
01/01/1903NOTE - 01 7/12/91 ORD: BRF OF APLT DUE NOTE - 01 BY 8/28/91; BRF OF APLE DUE BY NOTE - 02 10/07/91; REPLY BRF DUE BY NOTE - 02 10/28/91; SCHED CASE ON NOTE - 03 JANUARY 1992 CALENDAR; NFX. NOTE - 03
09/13/1989NOTICE OF APPEAL
09/26/1989APPOINTING COUNSEL/CO REFERRAL (CJA) STEVEN WEINBERG, ESQ. PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
10/06/1989APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT AD PANEL SCDATE 100689 SCHPRD DSA
10/31/1989ACTION SLIP MAILED AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
10/31/1989RECORD ON APPEAL (80 PGS/RUST) AD PANEL SCDATE 111389 SCHPRD R
11/06/1989APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 40 DAYS AFTER COMPLETION OF TRANSCRIPT AD PANEL SCDATE 121189 SCHPRD BA
12/11/1989ORDER GRANT APLT MO FOR EXT TO FILE BR; APLT BR DUE W/IN 40 DAYS AFTER RT FILED JB PANELRBH SCDATE 112189 SCHPRD U
01/18/1990SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #1 (108-PGS/HART) AJ PANEL SCDATE 022390 SCHPRD RT
03/08/1990SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #2(5 PGS/GALLO) AD PANEL SCDATE 022490 SCHPRD RT
03/08/1990RECORD COMPLETED
07/12/1991ORDER SEE NOTE FIELDS 01 - 03 GR PANELRBH SCDATE 070991 SCHPRD GR
08/28/1991APPELLANT'S BRIEF PR PANEL SCDATE 082891 SCHPRD BA
10/07/1991APPELEE'S BRIEF AJ PANEL SCDATE 100791 SCHPRD BE
10/07/1991BRIEFS COMPLETED
12/02/1991ORDER COURT'S 7/12/91 ORDER MODIFIED TO EXTENT CASE SCHEDULED IN FEB 1992. MEH PANELRO SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
01/29/1992LETTER SUMMARY II ARGUMENT REQUEST NOTICE - 10 DAYS TO RESP. CKT PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
03/09/1992FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
03/09/1992SUBMITTED to JJ KG RY PY.
03/27/1992AFFIRMED MOJ AF JUDGMENT ON APPEAL (KG RY PY)
04/17/1992MANDATE ISSUED