judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

JOSEPH E. WALLER V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 88-CF-0503
Short Caption:JOSEPH E. WALLER V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Drug Related
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:F11366-87Filed Date:05/03/1988

Opening Event Date:05/03/1988Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:05/04/1988Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:
Argued/Submitted:
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:08/02/1989

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantJoseph E. Waller N
Bernard Jay Williams NN
AppelleeUnited StatesN
John R. Fisher NN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901WALLER, JOSEPH E. AKA WITHERSPOON, JAMES D. UNITED STATES
01/01/1903NOTE - 01 CO-DEF THOMAS SMITH NOTE - 01
05/03/1988FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
05/04/1988FiledRecord Completed
05/04/1988SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #1 (218 PGS - SCHOCH) JB PANEL SCDATE 070188 SCHPRD RT
05/12/1988APPOINTING COUNSEL/CO REFERRAL (CJA) BERNARD JAY WILLIAMS, ESQ. PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
05/23/1988APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT MLH PANEL SCDATE 052388 SCHPRD DSA
06/28/1988RECORD ON APPEAL GT PANEL SCDATE 070488 SCHPRD R
10/27/1988ACTION SLIP MAILED JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
11/18/1988APPELLEE'S MOTION TO CONSOLIDATE WITH 88-254 (NO OPPO) JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
12/05/1988COUNSEL'S MOTION TO WITHDRAW (ANDERS) GT PANEL SCDATE 120688 SCHPRD BA
01/12/1989LETTER ANDERS LTR TO APLT; RESPONSE DUE BY 2/12/89. DAS PANELDDW SCDATE 121588 SCHPRD CHECK
07/12/1989AFFIRMED JUDGMENT GRANTING APLT COUNSEL MO TO W/DRAW & AFFIRMING THE JUDGMENT ON APPEAL. ACG PANELMKSC SCDATE 062889 SCHPRD VS
07/12/1989DISP NO - 01 DISP - AF METH -JDG JUDGE -PC CITE
08/02/1989MANDATE ISSUED PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD