judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

GARY W. LYLES V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 89-CF-0940
Short Caption:GARY W. LYLES V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Assault Related
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:F196-89Filed Date:09/11/1989

Opening Event Date:09/11/1989Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:11/22/1989Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:07/03/1990
Argued/Submitted:10/24/1990
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:11/29/1990

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantGary W. Lyles N
Roger C. Wesley NN
AppellantJohn Doe N
Michael J. Dennis YN
AppelleeUnited StatesN
John R. Fisher YN
Gilberto De Jesus YN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901LYLES, GARY W. UNITED STATES
01/01/1903NOTE - 01 06/13/90 ORD: GRANT MO OF APLT NOTE - 01 TO SUBSTITUTE COUNS & THE NOTE - 02 APPNTMT OF ROGER WESLEY, ESQ., NOTE - 02 IS VACATED, & MICHAEL DENNIS, NOTE - 03 ESQ., IS APPOINTED TO REPRESNT NOTE - 03 APLT ON APPEAL. F/O NEWLY- NOTE - 04 APPOINTED COUNSL TO ADVISE CRT NOTE - 04 WHETHER HE INTENDS TO FL A NOTE - 05 SUPPLMNTL BRF ON BEHALF OF NOTE - 05 APLT.
01/01/1906 WESLEYR VACATED 6/13/90
09/11/1989FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
09/26/1989APPOINTING COUNSEL/CO REFERRAL (CJA) ROGER C. WESLEY, ESQ. PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
10/05/1989APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT AD PANEL SCDATE 100689 SCHPRD DSA
11/06/1989ACTION SLIP MAILED RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
11/06/1989RECORD ON APPEAL (13 PGS. -- PIRFO) RJG PANEL SCDATE 111089 SCHPRD R
11/22/1989FiledRecord Completed
11/22/1989SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #1(3 PGS/TANNER) AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
12/18/1989APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 40 DAYS AFTER COMPLETION OF TRANSCRIPT AD PANEL SCDATE 121889 SCHPRD BA
01/12/1990ORDER GRANT APLT MO FOR EXT TO FILE BR; APLT BR DUE W/IN 40 DAYS AFTER RT FILED JB PANELRBH SCDATE 010490 SCHPRD U
01/25/1990LETTER IN RE TO CASE STATUS PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
02/14/1990SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #2 (281 PGS. -- SCHERTZER) RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
02/23/1990APPELLANT'S BRIEF AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
03/30/1990APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO APRIL 30, 1990 RJG FVH PANEL SCDATE 033090 SCHPRD BE
04/30/1990APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO MAY 30, 1990 AJ PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
05/08/1990SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #3 (26 PGS. -- RHOADES) RJG PANEL SCDATE 021690 SCHPRD RT
05/18/1990COUNSEL'S MOTION TO WITHDRAW FOR BUSINESS REASONS AJ PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
05/30/1990APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 6-20-90 NO OPPO AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
06/13/1990APPOINTING COUNSEL/CO REFERRAL (CJA) MICHAEL J. DENNIS, ESQ. PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
06/13/1990ORDER SEE NOTE FIELDS 02 THUR 06 GW PANELRO SCDATE 060490 SCHPRD V
06/20/1990RECEIVED APPELLEE'S BRIEF AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
07/03/1990FiledBriefing Completed
07/03/1990APPELEE'S BRIEF FVH PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
10/24/1990FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
10/24/1990SUBMITTED PANELSTFAKN SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
11/07/1990AFFIRMED MOJ AF JUDGMENT ON APPEAL (CASE RM FOR ACTION CONSISTENT w/thorne v. us, 471 A.2d 247) PANELSTFAKN SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
11/07/1990DISP NO - 01 DISP - AF METH -MOJ JUDGE -PC CITE
11/29/1990MANDATE ISSUED PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD