judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

RANDOLPH RIVERS V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 89-CF-0942
Short Caption:RANDOLPH RIVERS V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Robbery Related
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:F7648-88Filed Date:09/12/1989

Opening Event Date:09/12/1989Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:01/11/1990Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:05/29/1991
Argued/Submitted:11/13/1991
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:12/10/1991

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantRandolph Rivers N
James W. KleinNY
Page Kennedy YN
AppellantJohn Doe N
Page Kennedy YN
AppelleeUnited StatesN
John R. Fisher YN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901RIVERS, RANDOLPH UNITED STATES
01/01/1905TRDATE- 91/11/13 ACTION - ARG ATTY 1 - SWABYC FOR - APPELLANT ATTY 2 - KLEIND FOR - APPELLEE
09/12/1989FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
09/29/1989ORDER APPOINTING JAMES KLEIN, ESQ. AS COUNSEL FOR APLT. DOCKETING STATEMENT DUE IN 10 DAYS. GG PANELRO SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
10/10/1989APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT AD PANEL SCDATE 101089 SCHPRD DSA
11/22/1989DESIGNATION OF RECORD AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
01/11/1990FiledRecord Completed
01/11/1990ACTION SLIP MAILED RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
01/11/1990RECORD ON APPEAL RJG PANEL SCDATE 111389 SCHPRD R
01/22/1990APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO COMPLETION OF TRANSCRIPT AD PANEL SCDATE 022090 SCHPRD BA
02/16/1990ORDER GRANT APLT MO FOR EXT TO FILE BR; APLT BR DUE W/IN 40 DAYS AFTER RT FILED JB PANELRBH SCDATE 020890 SCHPRD U
02/27/1990SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #1 (282 PGS. -- HART) RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
04/15/1991LETTER GRANT APLT'S RQST TO PRESENT ORAL ARGUMENT. CT PANELJAC SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
04/24/1991APPELLANT'S BRIEF RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
05/29/1991FiledBriefing Completed
05/29/1991APPELEE'S BRIEF AJ PANEL SCDATE 052991 SCHPRD BE
10/03/1991APPELLANT'S MOTION REQUESTING ORAL ARGUMENT AJ PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
10/24/1991APPELLANT'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE REPLY BRIEF APPELLANT'S RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
10/24/1991RECEIVED APPELLANT'S REPLY BRIEF RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
11/12/1991ORDER GRANT APLT'S MOT FOR LV TO FILE RBA, LODGED RBA KHO PANELFESCKN SCDATE 111291 SCHPRD O
11/12/1991APPELLANT'S REPLY BRIEF KHO PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
11/13/1991FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
11/13/1991ARGUED PANELFESCKN SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
11/18/1991AFFIRMED MOJ AF JUDGMENT ON APPEAL PANELFESCKN SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
11/18/1991DISP NO - 01 DISP - AF METH -MOJ JUDGE -PC CITE
12/10/1991MANDATE ISSUED PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD