judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

RUDOLPH TATE V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 89-CF-1103
Short Caption:RUDOLPH TATE V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Drug Related
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:F14527-88Filed Date:09/20/1989

Opening Event Date:09/20/1989Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:
Argued/Submitted:
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:05/22/1990

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantRudolph Tate N
Dennis M. O'Connor NN
AppelleeUnited StatesN
John R. Fisher NN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901TATE, RUDOLPH UNITED STATES
09/20/1989FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
09/26/1989APPOINTING COUNSEL/CO REFERRAL (CJA) DENNIS M. O'CONNOR, ESQ. PANEL SCDATE 100289 SCHPRD DSA
11/30/1989APPELLANT'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE DS AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
11/30/1989RECEIVED APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATE AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
12/14/1989APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT GW PANEL SCDATE 112089 SCHPRD R
01/22/1990RECORD ON APPEAL (200 PGS. -- PIRFO) RJG PANEL SCDATE 112089 SCHPRD R
03/08/1990APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO FORTY DAYS (NO OPPO) AJ PANEL SCDATE 030590 SCHPRD BA
03/15/1990ORDER GRANT APLT'S MO TO EXT TM TO FL BRIEF WITHIN 30 DAYS; NFX. GW PANELRBH SCDATE 031290 SCHPRD N
04/17/1990APPELLANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS/WITHDRAW APPEAL RJG PANEL SCDATE 041690 SCHPRD BA
04/30/1990FiledOUTCOME/DISPOSITION - Outcome-Disposition
04/30/1990ORDER GRANTING APLT'S MOTION AND DISMISSING APPEAL. FVH PANELRO SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
04/30/1990DISP NO - 01 DISP - DS METH -ORD JUDGE -RO CITE
05/22/1990MANDATE ISSUED PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD