judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

RONNIE POPE V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 89-CF-0948
Short Caption:RONNIE POPE V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Drug Related
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:F478-88Filed Date:09/13/1989

Opening Event Date:09/13/1989Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:11/02/1989Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:
Argued/Submitted:
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:02/21/1991

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantRonnie Pope N
Paul H. ZukerbergNY
AppelleeUnited StatesN
John R. Fisher NN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901POPE, RONNIE UNITED STATES
09/13/1989FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
09/26/1989APPOINTING COUNSEL/CO REFERRAL (CJA) PAUL H. ZUKERBERG, ESQ. PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
10/17/1989APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT PANEL SCDATE 100689 SCHPRD DSA
10/20/1989RECEIVED CT RPTR BURNS CERRTIFICATION OF 5/5/88 PROCEEDING (CASE ON TAPE) JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
11/02/1989FiledRecord Completed
11/02/1989ACTION SLIP MAILED AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
11/02/1989RECORD ON APPEAL (15 PGS/BURNS) AD PANEL SCDATE 111389 SCHPRD R
11/07/1989SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #1 (96 PGS. -- RHOADES) RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
11/20/1989SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #2(147 PGS/RUST) AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
12/06/1989SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #3 (346-PGS SWARINGER) AJ PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
12/11/1989APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF UNTIL 40 DAY AFTER TRANSCRIPT IS COMPLETED AJ PANEL SCDATE 121289 SCHPRD BA
12/19/1989SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #4(10 PGS/BOSTON) AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
01/12/1990ORDER GRANT APLT MO FOR EXT TO FILE BR; APLT BR DUE W/IN 40 DAYS AFTER RT FILED JB PANELRBH SCDATE 010390 SCHPRD U
01/23/1990SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #1 (100 PGS - CALHOUN) (SEE 89-924 FOR RT) JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
02/14/1990SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #5(130 PGS/SWARINGER) AD PANEL SCDATE 021890 SCHPRD RT
02/16/1990SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #6 (10-PGS/BURNEY) AJ PANEL SCDATE 022190 SCHPRD RT
03/23/1990SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #7 (14-PGS/GALLO) AJ PANEL SCDATE 022290 SCHPRD RT
05/18/1990SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #1 (374 PGS - GLEASON) (SEE 89-924 FOR RT) JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
10/04/1990ORDER BRIEF OF APPELLANT SHALL BE FILED W/IN 40 DYS FROM DATE OF ORDER (REC COMPLETE) JB PANELRBH SCDATE 092490 SCHPRD CHECK
11/13/1990APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 30 DAYS AJ PANEL SCDATE 111390 SCHPRD BA
12/07/1990ORDER GRT APLT MO X TM TO FL BRF BY 12/13/90. NFX. JJ PANELRBH SCDATE 112890 SCHPRD B
12/17/1990APPELLANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS/WITHDRAW APPEAL AD PANEL SCDATE 121390 SCHPRD BA
01/29/1991FiledOUTCOME/DISPOSITION - Outcome-Disposition
01/29/1991ORDER GRT APLT MO TO WITHDRAW APPEAL & CASE IS HEREBY DISMISSED. JJ PANELJWR SCDATE 011491 SCHPRD B
01/29/1991DISP NO - 01 DISP - DS METH -ORD JUDGE -RO CITE
02/21/1991MANDATE ISSUED PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD