judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

CHARLES R. PUGH V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 89-CF-0924
Short Caption:CHARLES R. PUGH V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Drug Related
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:F479-88Filed Date:09/11/1989

Opening Event Date:09/11/1989Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:11/20/1990Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:12/28/1990
Argued/Submitted:03/12/1991
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:04/09/1991

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantCharles R. Pugh N
Daniel J. Harn YN
AppelleeUnited StatesN
John R. Fisher YN
Ralph J. Caccia YN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901PUGH, CHARLES R. UNITED STATES
01/01/1903NOTE - 01 CODEF: DAMON K. PATTERSON, NOTE - 01 RONNIE POPE, ANTHONY GRAHAM JR NOTE - 02 & ALEXIS R. WILSON NOTE - 02
01/01/1905TRDATE- 91/03/12 ACTION - ARG ATTY 1 - HARND FOR - APPELLANT ATTY 2 - CACCIAR FOR - APPELLEE
09/11/1989FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
09/26/1989APPOINTING COUNSEL/CO REFERRAL (CJA) DANIEL J. HARN, ESQ. PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
11/07/1989SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #1 (96 PGS - RHOADES) (SEE 89-948 FOR RT) JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
11/20/1989SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #2 (147 PGS - RUST) (SEE 89-948 FOR RT) JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
12/06/1989SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #3 (346 PGS - SWARINGER) (SEE 89-948 FOR RT) JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
01/11/1990RECORD ON APPEAL AD PANEL SCDATE 111089 SCHPRD R
01/23/1990SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #1 (100 PGS. -- CALHOUN) RJG PANEL SCDATE 022790 SCHPRD RT
03/05/1990ORDER COUNSEL FOR APPELLANT TO FILE DOCKETING STATEMENT W/IN 10 DAYS FROM DATE OF ORDER JB PANELRBH SCDATE 100689 SCHPRD DSA
03/16/1990APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT AD PANEL SCDATE 031590 SCHPRD DSA
05/18/1990SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #1 (374-PGS/GLEASON) AJ PANEL SCDATE 022890 SCHPRD RT
10/04/1990ORDER BRIEF OF APPELLANT SHALL BE FILED W/IN 40 DYS FROM DATE OF ORDER (REC COMPLETE) JB PANELRBH SCDATE 092490 SCHPRD CHECK
11/14/1990APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO NOV. 28, 1990 ( NO OPPO) AJ PANEL SCDATE 111390 SCHPRD BA
11/20/1990FiledRecord Completed
11/20/1990ORDER GRT APLT MO X TM TO FL BRF TO 11/28/90. NFX. JJ PANELRBH SCDATE 111690 SCHPRD B
11/28/1990APPELLANT'S BRIEF AD PANEL SCDATE 112890 SCHPRD BA
12/28/1990FiledBriefing Completed
12/28/1990APPELEE'S BRIEF RJG PANEL SCDATE 122890 SCHPRD BE
03/12/1991FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
03/12/1991ARGUED RJG PANELBESTSC SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
03/19/1991AFFIRMED MOJ AFFIRMING JUDGEMENT ON APPEAL RJG PANELBESTSC SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
03/19/1991DISP NO - 01 DISP - AF METH -MOJ JUDGE -PC CITE
04/09/1991MANDATE ISSUED PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD