judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

GLENN B. WRIGHT V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 89-CF-0938
Short Caption:GLENN B. WRIGHT V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Drug Related
Lead: 89-CF-0913 Consolidated: 89-CF-0936 , 89-CF-0937 , 89-CF-0938
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:F3729-89Filed Date:09/06/1989

Opening Event Date:09/06/1989Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:02/06/1990Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:08/17/1990
Argued/Submitted:
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:02/12/1991

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantGlenn B. Wright N
AppelleeUnited StatesN
John R. Fisher YN
Gilberto De Jesus YN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901WRIGHT, GLENN B. UNITED STATES
01/01/1903NOTE - 01 10/2/89 ORD: SS, CONS 89-913, NOTE - 01 89-936, 89-937, & 89-938; NOTE - 02 PETER MEYERS APPTD FOR APLT; NOTE - 02 APLT TO FL DSA IN 10 DAYS. NOTE - 03 CON 89-913, 89-936, & 89-937 NOTE - 03
09/06/1989FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
10/02/1989APPOINTING COUNSEL/CO REFERRAL (CJA) PETER H. MEYERS, ESQ. PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
10/02/1989ORDER SEE NOTE FIELDS 01 AND 02. DAS PANELRO SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
10/05/1989APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT RJG PANEL SCDATE 101289 SCHPRD DSA
11/16/1989RECORD ON APPEAL (RTC) AD PANEL SCDATE 110689 SCHPRD R
02/01/1990RECEIVED CT RPTR FARMER CERTIFICATION OF 8/8/89 PROC. (DUPLICATE REQUEST) JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
02/06/1990FiledRecord Completed
02/06/1990ACTION SLIP MAILED AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
02/06/1990SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #1(20 PGS/FARMER) AD PANEL SCDATE 110689 SCHPRD RT
03/14/1990APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO APRIL 18, 1990 AJ PANEL SCDATE 031990 SCHPRD BA
04/06/1990APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO MAY 18, 1990 AJ PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
04/10/1990ORDER GRANT APLT'S MO TO EXT TM TO FILE BRIEF TO 4/18/90; NFX. GW PANELRBH SCDATE 041890 SCHPRD OPE
04/17/1990APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 30 DAYS AJ PANEL SCDATE 041890 SCHPRD BE
05/03/1990APPELLANT'S MOTION TO CONSOLIDATE IN 89-913 W/ THIS CASE AND 89-936 AND 89-937 AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
05/17/1990RECEIVED APPELLANT'S BRIEF AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
06/18/1990APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 7-18-90 AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
07/18/1990APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 30 DAYS AFTER TRANSCRIPT IS PREPARED AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
07/19/1990APPELLANT'S BRIEF FVH PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
07/19/1990ORDER DENYING MCONA; FO MXBA GRTD & CLK DIRED TO FILE LODGED BR; FO BE DUE W/IN 30 DAYS. FVH PANELRO SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
08/17/1990FiledBriefing Completed
08/17/1990APPELEE'S BRIEF GG PANEL SCDATE 082090 SCHPRD BE
10/22/1990APPELLANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS/WITHDRAW APPEAL OR AFFIRM AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
01/19/1991FiledOUTCOME/DISPOSITION - Outcome-Disposition
01/19/1991ORDER GRANT MO OF APLT TO DISMISS CASE. DAS PANELRO SCDATE 081790 SCHPRD READY
01/19/1991DISP NO - 01 DISP - DS METH -ORD JUDGE -RO CITE
02/12/1991MANDATE ISSUED PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD