Case: 10-0142
10-0142
03/01/2010
Petition for Review/Cause under Tex. R. App. P. 59.1
ANGELA MAE BRANNAN, INDIVIDUALLY AND AS INDEPENDENT EXECUTRIX OF THE ESTATE OF BOB ALBERT BRANNAN, DECEASED, ET AL.
STATE OF TEXAS, ET AL.
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Remarks | Document |
---|---|---|---|---|
03/21/2011 | Letter brief | Petitioner | Response to the State's Letter Brief on Mootness (12) filed on behalf of Angela Brennan. | |
03/11/2011 | Letter brief | Respondent | Supplemental Letter Brief in Response to Reply Brief filed on behalf of The State of Texas, General Land Office of Texas, Jerry Patterson, Land Commissioner and Greg Abbott, Attorney General. (12) | |
02/25/2011 | Reply Brief | Petitioner | Petitioners' Reply Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Angela Mae Brannan, et al. (12) | |
01/31/2011 | Brief on the Merits | Respondent | Brief on the merits (12) filed on behalf of The Village of Surfside Beach, Texas. | |
01/28/2011 | Brief on the Merits | Respondent | Respondent's brief on the merits. On behalf of State of Texas, et al. (orig & 11) | |
12/06/2010 | Brief on the Merits | Petitioner | Brief on the merits (12) filed on behalf of Angela Mae Brannan. | |
09/17/2010 | Reply to Response | Petitioner | Reply to the joint response to petition for review (12) filed on behalf of Angela Mae Branna. | |
08/24/2010 | Amended Response to Petition for Review filed | Respondent | Amended joint response to petition (12) filed on behalf of State of Texas. | |
08/18/2010 | Response to Petition | Respondent | Joint response to petition for review filed on behalf of State of Texas, et al. and The Village of Surfside Beach, Texas (orig & 11). | |
04/30/2010 | Supplemental appendix | Petitioner | Supplement to the Appendix to the Petition for Review. On behalf of Angela Mae Brannan, et al. (12) | |
04/20/2010 | Appendix Filed | Petitioner | attached to petition | |
04/20/2010 | Petition for Review | Petitioner | Petition appendix attached (12) filed on behalf of Angela Mae Brannan. |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Remarks | Document | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
05/19/2014 | Case Stored - stored case location updated | Row 11 H-3 | | |||||||
03/19/2013 | Case Stored | G02 Row 21 B-5 | | |||||||
03/06/2013 | Mandate issued | Mandate & Cost Bill Issued |
| |||||||
01/25/2013 | Court approved judgment sent to attorneys of record | Issued | | |||||||
01/25/2013 | Opinion issued | Judgment of CA vacated; cause remanded to CA | Pursuant to Texas Rule of Appellate Procedure 59.1, after granting the petition for review and without hearing oral argument, the Court vacates the court of appeals' judgment and remands the case to that court. (Chief Justice Jefferson, Justice Lehrmann, and Justice Boyd not sitting) |
| ||||||
01/25/2013 | Petition for Review disposed | Petition granted pursuant to TRAP 59.1 | | | ||||||
01/25/2013 | Petition for Review granted under TRAP 59.1 | | | |||||||
09/12/2011 | Address Change | Notice of change of address for pet's atty, Mr. J. David Breemer, | | |||||||
03/21/2011 | Letter brief | Response to the State's Letter Brief on Mootness (12) filed on behalf of Angela Brennan. | | |||||||
03/11/2011 | Letter brief | Supplemental Letter Brief in Response to Reply Brief filed on behalf of The State of Texas, General Land Office of Texas, Jerry Patterson, Land Commissioner and Greg Abbott, Attorney General. (12) | | |||||||
02/25/2011 | Reply Brief | Petitioners' Reply Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Angela Mae Brannan, et al. (12) | ||||||||
02/16/2011 | Motion for Extension of Time disposed. | Filing granted | Unopposed motionf or extension of time to file reply brief on the merits granted. Reply brief due no later than 3:00 p.m. on 2/25/11; mailbox rule does not apply. Further requests for extensions of time will be disfavored. | |||||||
02/09/2011 | Motion for Extension of Time to File Brief filed | Unopposed motion for extension of time to file reply brief (2) filed on behalf of Angela Mae Brannan. | | |||||||
01/31/2011 | Brief on the Merits | Brief on the merits (12) filed on behalf of The Village of Surfside Beach, Texas. | ||||||||
01/28/2011 | Brief on the Merits | Respondent's brief on the merits. On behalf of State of Texas, et al. (orig & 11) | ||||||||
01/20/2011 | Motion for Extension of Time disposed. | Filing granted | Unopposed joint motion for a seven-day extension of time to respond to petitioners' brief on the merits granted. Response brief due no later than 3:00 p.m. on 1/28/11; Reply brief due 2/14/11; mailbox rule does not apply. Further requests for extensions of time will be disfavored. | |||||||
01/19/2011 | Motion for Extension of Time to File Brief filed | 2nd unopposed joint motion for a 7-days extension of time to file Respondents' Brief on the Merits. On behalf of State of Texas, et al. and The Village of Surfside Beach, Texas (2) | | |||||||
12/22/2010 | Motion for Extension of Time disposed. | Filing granted | Respondent's unopposed motion for extension of time to file brief on the merits granted. Response brief due no later than 3:00 p.m. on 1/21/11; Reply brief due 2/7/11; mailbox rule does not apply. Further requests for extensions of time will be disfavored. | |||||||
12/17/2010 | Motion for Extension of Time to File Brief filed | Unopposed joint motion for extension of time to file brief (2) filed on behalf of State of Texas and Village of Surfside Beach, Texas. | | |||||||
12/06/2010 | Brief on the Merits | Brief on the merits (12) filed on behalf of Angela Mae Brannan. | ||||||||
11/18/2010 | Motion for Extension of Time disposed. | Filing granted | Unopposed second motion for extension of time to file brief on the merits granted. Petitioners brief due no later than 3:00 p.m. on 12/6/10; Response brief due 12/27/10; Reply brief due 1/11/11; mailbox rule does not apply. No further requests for extensions of time will be considered. | |||||||
11/17/2010 | Motion for Extension of Time to File Brief filed | Unopposed second motion for extension of time to file brief (2) filed on behalf of Angela Mae Brannan. | | |||||||
11/01/2010 | Case Record Filed | Electronic version of COA Record. Inventory in remarks | | |||||||
10/18/2010 | Motion for Extension of Time disposed. | Filing granted | Petitioner's brief is due no later than 3pm, November 22, 2010. Response brief is due no later than 3pm, December 13, 2010. Reply brief is due no later than 3pm, December 28, 2010. further requests will be disfavored. mailbox rule does not apply. | |||||||
10/15/2010 | Motion for Extension of Time to File Brief filed | Unopposed motion for extension of time to file brief on the merits (2) filed on behalf of Angela Mae Brannan. | | |||||||
10/05/2010 | Record Requested in Petition for Review | | | |||||||
10/01/2010 | Brief on the Merits Requested | Brief on the merits requested: Petitioner's brief due no later than 3:00 p.m. on 11/1/10; Respondent's brief due 11/22/10; Reply brief due 12/7/10; mailbox rule does not apply | ||||||||
09/17/2010 | Reply to Response | Reply to the joint response to petition for review (12) filed on behalf of Angela Mae Branna. | ||||||||
09/13/2010 | Pro hac vice motion disposed | Filing granted | Ted Hirtz's Motion in Support of J. David Breemer to appear pro hac vice is granted. | |||||||
09/13/2010 | Pro hac vice motion disposed | Filing granted | J. David Breemer's Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice is granted. | |||||||
09/09/2010 | Call received | Received faxed copy of certificate of conference indicating that motion is unopposed. | | |||||||
09/08/2010 | Phone call from Clerk's Office | Left message for Mr. Breemer. Requested certificate of conference for motion to appear pro hac vice. | | |||||||
09/08/2010 | MET to file reply disposed of | Filing granted | The reply is due September 23, 2010. FURTHER REQUESTS FOR EXTENSIONS OF TIME FOR THIS FILING WILL BE DISFAVORED | |||||||
09/03/2010 | Phone call from Clerk's Office | Requested additional $10.00 for motion in support of pro hac vice. | | |||||||
09/03/2010 | Pro hac vice motion filed | Mr. Ted Hirtz's motion in support of motion for admission pro hac vice (INCORPORATED WITH MOTION TO APPEAR) (2) filed on behalf of Angela Mae Brannan. | | |||||||
09/03/2010 | Pro hac vice motion filed | Mr. David Breemer's motion for admission pro hac vice (INCORPORATED WITH MOTION IN SUPPORT) (2) filed on behalf of Angela Mae Brannan. | | |||||||
08/31/2010 | Phone call from Clerk's Office | Requested fee for motion for extension of time. Left message with Mr. Hirtz. | | |||||||
08/31/2010 | Motion to Extend Time to File Reply filed | Unopposed motion for extension of time to file reply (2) filed on behalf of Angela Mae Brannan. | | |||||||
08/25/2010 | Motion for leave to file brief disposed | Filing granted | Respondents' Unopposed Joint Motion for Leave to File an Amended Response to the Petition for Review is granted. The amended response was filed in this office on August 24, 2010. | |||||||
08/24/2010 | Motion for Leave to File Amended Brief filed | Unopposed joint motion for leave to file an amended response to petition (2) filed on behalf of State of Texas, et al. | | |||||||
08/24/2010 | Amended Response to Petition for Review filed | Amended joint response to petition (12) filed on behalf of State of Texas. | ||||||||
08/19/2010 | Correction filed (See Remarks) | Letter correcting one-word in the joint response filed by The State of Texas and Surfside Beach, Texas. (orig & 11) | | |||||||
08/18/2010 | Response to Petition | Joint response to petition for review filed on behalf of State of Texas, et al. and The Village of Surfside Beach, Texas (orig & 11). | ||||||||
07/15/2010 | Motion for Extension of Time disposed. | Filing granted | Response is due no later than 3pm, August 18, 2010. further requests will be disfavored. mailbox rule does not apply. | |||||||
07/14/2010 | Motion for Extension of Time to File Response | Joint motion for extension of time to file Response to Petiton for Review. On behalf of State of Texas, et al. and Village of Surfside Beach, Texas. (2) | | |||||||
06/17/2010 | Supreme Court of Texas Requested Response | Response requested to petition for review due no later than 3:00 p.m. on 7/19/10; mailbox rule does not apply | ||||||||
05/25/2010 | Case forwarded to Court | | | |||||||
05/19/2010 | Response Waiver filed | Response waiver filed on behalf of Village of Surfside Beach. (2) | | |||||||
04/30/2010 | Supplemental appendix | Supplement to the Appendix to the Petition for Review. On behalf of Angela Mae Brannan, et al. (12) | | |||||||
04/28/2010 | Phone call from Clerk's Office | Spoke with Mr. Hirtz. Requested trial court judgment. | | |||||||
04/20/2010 | Appendix Filed | attached to petition | | |||||||
04/20/2010 | Petition for Review | Petition appendix attached (12) filed on behalf of Angela Mae Brannan. | ||||||||
03/02/2010 | Motion for Extension of Time to File Petition for Review disposed | Filing granted | M/e/t to file pet/rev is granted. Pet/rev is due April 21, 2010 | |||||||
03/01/2010 | Motion for Extension of Time to File Petition for Review filed | PET's unopposed motion for extension of time to file petition (3) filed on behalf of Angela Mae Brannan. | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set | Remarks |
---|---|---|---|
03/19/2013 | Case Stored | Case stored. | G02 Row 21 B-5 |
05/19/2014 | Case Stored | Case stored. | Row 11 H-3 |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
State of Texas | Respondent | Ms. Cynthia Woelk Ms. Elizabeth R. B. Sterling Mr. William J. "Bill" Cobb III Mr. Daniel T. Hodge Ms. Barbara Bryant Deane Mr. David Preister Ms. Liz Bills Mr. Gregory Abbott Mr. Brian E. Berwick Mr. Kenneth C. Cross |
Village of Surfside Beach, Texas | Respondent | Mr. George W. Vie III Ms. Adrienne B. Kvello |
Environmental Defense and Surfrider Foundation | Intervenor | Ms. Laura Ruth Jacks |
Aplin, Reg | Intervenor | Mr. Ted Hirtz |
Brennan, Angela Mae | Petitioner | Mr. Ted Hirtz Mr. J. David Breemer |
Court of Appeals Information:
01-08-00179-CV
Aff/Pt and Dismiss/Pt
365 SW3d 1, 02-04-10
1st Court of Appeals
Honorable Elsa Alcala
Trial Court Information
239th District Court
Brazoria
Honorable Patrick Edward Sebesta
15802