judyrecords
search tips
740 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

JACOBSON VS. GLOVER C/W 42082

Case Information: 42716
Short Caption:JACOBSON VS. GLOVER C/W 42082Court:Supreme Court
Consolidated: 42082 *, 42716
Lower Court Case(s):Carson City - First Judicial District - 0301242AClassification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: En Banc
To SP/Judge:02/11/2004 / Worrell, CarolynSP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:06/29/2005 at 9:00 AMOral Argument Location:Carson City
Submission Date:06/29/2005How Submitted:After Oral Argument

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
01/29/2004Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $250.00 from Charles M. Kilpatrick, Ltd.--check no. 7936.
01/29/2004Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Settlement. Notice re: settlement conference program/suspension of rules mailed to all counsel. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) 04-01879
02/04/2004MotionFiled Motion to Consolidate. Nos. 42716/42082. 04-02256
02/11/2004Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Carolyn Worrell. (Briefing and preparation of transcripts suspended pending further order of this court.)
02/11/2004Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement. 04-02686
02/13/2004Notice/Outgoing Letter. Carolyn Worrell. (docketing statement)
03/22/2004Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this matter. Nos. 42082/42716-not consolidated. 04-05397
04/29/2004Settlement Order/ProceduralFiled Order: No Settlement/Briefing Reinstated. Order Consolidating Appeals and Reinstating Briefing. Appellants have filed a motion to consolidate these related appeals. Cause appearing, we grant the unopposed motion. See NRAP 3(b). The parties were unable to agree to a settlement. We reinstate the deadlines for requesting transcripts and filing briefs. Appellants: 15 days to comply with NRAP 9(a); 120 days to file and serve opening brief and appendix. Briefing shall proceed in accordance with NRAP 31(a)(1). Nos. 42082/ 42716. (04-07832)
05/13/2004Transcript RequestFiled Certificate of No Transcript Request. Nos. 42082/42716 (04-08953).
05/14/2004Notice/IncomingFiled Notice of Association of Counsel. Representing appellants: Robert L. Eisenberg of Lemons, Grundy & Eisenberg. Nos. 42082/42716. (04-08987)
08/30/2004MotionFiled Motion and Order Extending Time. Brief due: September 27, 2004. Nos. 42082/42716 (04-15719).
09/27/2004MotionFiled Motion and Order/Excess Pages. Motion for Permission to File 34-Page (Opening) Brief. Granted: 34 pages. Nos. 42082/42716 (04-17889).
09/27/2004BriefFiled Opening Brief. Nos. 42082/42716 (04-17890).
09/27/2004AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief. Nos. 42082/42716 (04-17891).
10/25/2004MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. Motion for Extension of Time for Filing Responding Brief. Nos. 42082/42716 (04-19732).
10/25/2004MotionFiled Motion to Dismiss Appeal. Motion to Dismiss Appeal as to McDonald's Travel 'N' Fun (Third-Party Defendant Below) for Lack of Jurisdiction for Failure of the Estate of Daniel James Clayton (Third-Party Plaintiff Below) to File Notice of Appeal Pursuant to NRAP 4. Nos. 42080/42716 (04-19733).
10/27/2004BriefFiled Answering Brief. Estate of Clayton. Nos. 42082/42716 (04-19831).
10/28/2004MotionFiled Response to Motion. Appellants' Response to Motion to Dismiss Appeal as to McDonald's Travel 'N' Fun. Nos. 42082/42716 (04-19931).
10/28/2004MotionFiled Response to Motion. Appellants' Opposition to Motion for Extension of Time. Nos. 42082/42716 (04-19932).
11/30/2004MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. Motion for Extension of Time for Filing Reply Brief in Response to Answering Brief of Estate of Clayton, and Motion for Clarification Regarding Briefing Schedule. Nos. 42082/42716. (04-21813)
12/21/2004Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Partially Dismissing Appeal in No. 42082. McDonald's Travel argues that it should be dismissed from this appeal. We agree. Simply, Clayton's estate never appealed the district court's order dismissing its third-party claim; therefore, the dismissal is not at issue in this appeal. Accordingly, we dismiss McDonald's Travel from the appeal in Docket No. 42082. Appellants have moved for an extension of time to file their reply brief. We grant appellant's motion. Appellant's reply brief is due thirty days from the date of this order. fn2—[In light of this order we deny as moot McDonald's Travel's motion for an extension of time to file an answering brief.] Nos. 42082/42716 [04-23288]
12/23/2004BriefFiled Reply Brief. Nos. 42082/42716 (04-23425).
04/20/2005Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice Scheduling Oral Argument. Oral Argument is scheduled for 30 minutes in Carson City on June 29, 2005, at 9:00 a.m. (En Banc) (Nos. 42082/42716)
06/14/2005Notice/OutgoingIssued Oral Argument Reminder Notice. (Nos. 42082/42716)
06/29/2005Case Status Update Submitted for Decision. Before the En Banc Court. EN BANC. Nos. 42082/42716.
09/15/2005Opinion/DispositionalFiled Per Curiam Opinion. Reversed and remanded (Docket No. 42082); dismissed as moot (Docket No. 42716). "Dismissed as moot." Before the Court EN BANC. Author: Per Curiam. Majority: Becker, C.J., Rose, Maupin, Gibbons, Douglas, Hardesty, and Parraguirre, JJ. 121 Nev. Adv. Opn. No. 53. EN BANC. Nos. 42082/42716 05-18282
10/11/2005RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 05-18419
10/11/2005Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
10/18/2005RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on October 12, 2005. 05-18419