judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

DELORES A. BAILEY V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 89-CF-1104
Short Caption:DELORES A. BAILEY V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Drug Related
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:F2105-88Filed Date:09/21/1989

Opening Event Date:09/21/1989Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:06/14/1990Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:10/02/1991
Argued/Submitted:01/09/1992
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:03/23/1992

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantDelores A. Bailey N
Gregory C. Powell YN
AppelleeUnited StatesN
John R. Fisher YN
Thomas C. Black YN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901BAILEY, DELORES A. UNITED STATES
01/01/1903NOTE - 01 CO-DEF: LUTHER LINZY & NOTE - 01 LAWRENCE BROWN NOTE - 02 7/9/91 ORD: BRF OF APLT DUE BY NOTE - 02 8/28/91; BRF OF APLE DUE BY NOTE - 03 10/2/91; REPLY BRF OF APLT DUE NOTE - 03 BY 10/21/91; SCHED CASE ON JAN NOTE - 04 1992 CAL.; NFX. NOTE - 04
01/01/1905TRDATE- 92/01/09 ACTION - ARG ATTY 1 - POWELLG FOR - APPELLANT ATTY 2 - SMITHDE FOR - APPELLEE
09/21/1989NOTICE OF APPEAL
09/26/1989APPOINTING COUNSEL/CO REFERRAL (CJA) GREGORY C. POWELL, ESQ. PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
10/16/1989APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE DS RJG PANEL SCDATE 100689 SCHPRD DSA
10/23/1989RECEIVED APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATE AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
11/07/1989SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #1 IN 89-1096 & 89-944 (237 PGS. -- TREMEL) RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
11/14/1989APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT MEH PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
11/14/1989ORDER GRANT APLT MO TO FL LODGED DSA & APLT'S BRF DUE 40 DAYS AFTER RECORD COMPLETE. MEH PANELDDW SCDATE 110689 SCHPRD M
12/18/1989RECORD ON APPEAL AD RTC PANEL SCDATE 112089 SCHPRD R
06/14/1990SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #1(10 PGS/GALLO) AD PANEL SCDATE 050890 SCHPRD RT
06/14/1990RECORD COMPLETED
07/09/1991ORDER SEE NOTE FIELDS 02-04. EVH PANELRBH SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
07/22/1991APPELLANT'S BRIEF AJ PANEL SCDATE 082891 SCHPRD BA
10/02/1991APPELEE'S BRIEF AJ PANEL SCDATE 100291 SCHPRD BE
10/02/1991BRIEFS COMPLETED
01/09/1992FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
01/09/1992ARGUED PANELRGTEST SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
01/28/1992SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #2 (109 PGS. -- PIRFO) (6/6/89 PROCEEDINGS) RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
01/28/1992SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #3 (237 PGS. -- TREMEL) (6/8/89 PROCEEDINGS) RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
01/28/1992SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #4 (369 PGS. -- BURNEY) (6/7/89 PROCEEDINGS) RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
01/28/1992SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #5 (189 PGS. -- BURNEY) (6/5/89 PROCEEDINGS) RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
02/28/1992AFFIRMED MOJ AF JUDGMENT ON APPEAL PANELRGTEST SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
02/28/1992DISP NO - 01 DISP - AF METH -MOJ JUDGE -PC CITE
03/23/1992MANDATE ISSUED