Case Information: 42715 | |||
Short Caption: | HEALD (THOMAS) VS. STATE | Court: | Supreme Court |
Lower Court Case(s): | Washoe Co. - Second Judicial District - CR991305A | Classification: | Criminal Appeal - Fast Track - Post-Conviction |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | SP Status: | ||
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | How Submitted: | ||
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
01/28/2004 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Waived. | ||
01/28/2004 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person Fast Track. (Fast track notice mailed to trial counsel.) | 04-01832 | |
02/04/2004 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order/Show Cause. Appellant's counsel shall have 20 days from the date of this order to show cause why this appeal should not be dismissed for lack of jurisdiction. The deadlines for the filing of documents pursuant to NRAP 3C are suspended until further order of this court. | 04-02190 | |
02/20/2004 | Motion | Filed Response to Order to Show Cause. | 04-03289 | |
03/23/2004 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order/Briefing Reinstated. On February 20, 2004, counsel for appellant filed a response to our order to show cause. We conclude that we have jurisdiction over this appeal. Counsel for appellant shall have 40 days from the date of this order to file a fast track statement and appendix. Thereafter, this appeal shall proceed in accordance with the provisions of NRAP 3C. | 04-05482 | |
04/30/2004 | Order/Clerk's | Filed Order Granting Extension Per Telephonic Request. Fast Track Statement and Appendix due: May 10, 2004. | 04-07928 | |
05/10/2004 | Fast Track Brief | Filed Fast Track Statement. | 04-08683 | |
05/10/2004 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Fast Track Statement. | 04-08684 | |
05/26/2004 | Fast Track Brief | Filed Fast Track Response. | 04-09715 | |
09/16/2004 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." SNP04D-RR/WM/MD | 04-17033 | |
10/12/2004 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | 04-17171 | |
10/12/2004 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | ||
10/21/2004 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on October 18, 2004. | 04-17171 |