judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

ROLAND J. BAILEY V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 89-CF-0902
Short Caption:ROLAND J. BAILEY V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Drug Related
Lead:89-CF-0902Consolidated: 92-CO-0030
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:F11521-88Filed Date:08/25/1989

Opening Event Date:08/25/1989Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:
Argued/Submitted:
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:06/16/1993

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantRoland J. Bailey N
Mindy A. DanielsNY
AppelleeUnited StatesN
John R. Fisher NN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901BAILEY, ROLAND J. UNITED STATES
01/01/1902FOR RT
01/01/1903NOTE - 01 CODEF: JOHN KELLY & NOTE - 01 LINDA COOPER NOTE - 02 4/5/90 ORD: GRANT F/P MO OF NOTE - 02 APLT & MINDY DANIELS APPTD FOR NOTE - 03 APLT ON APPEAL; NEWLY APPTD NOTE - 03 COUNSEL IN 20 DAYS TO FL A NOTE - 04 STATE INDICATING WHETHER RT NOTE - 04 WILL BE PREPARED & ORDERED FOR NOTE - 05 PURPOSE OF APPEAL. NOTE - 05 NOTE - 06 6/12/91 ORD: BRF OF APLT DUE NOTE - 06 BY 8/14/91; BRF OF APLE DUE BY NOTE - 07 9/18/91; REPLY BRF OF APLT, NOTE - 07 IF ANY, DUE BY 10/7/91; SCHED NOTE - 08 CASE ON DEC 1991 CAL; NFX. NOTE - 08 NOTE - 09 9/23/91 ORD: GRANT MO OF APLT NOTE - 09 TO STAY CASE PENDG DISP OF 23- NOTE - 10 110 MO; 6/12/91 BRFNG ORD IS NOTE - 10 VACATED; APLT TO ADVISE THIS NOTE - 11 CRT IN 30 DAYS AS TO STATUS OF NOTE - 11 23-110 MO IN THE TRL CRT. NOTE - 12 1/30/92 ORD: SUA SPONTE THAT NOTE - 12 APPEAL NOS 89-902 & 92CF30 NOTE - 13 ARE CONSOLIDATED FR ALL NOTE - 13 PURPOSES HEREIN; MINDY A. NOTE - 14 DANIELS, ESQ IS APPTD TO RE- NOTE - 14 PRESENT APLT IN NO. 92CF30; NOTE - 15 APLT TO FL DSA IN NO. 92CF30 NOTE - 15 IN 10 DAYS. NOTE - 16 CONS: 92-30 NOTE - 16
08/25/1989NOTICE OF APPEAL
09/12/1989RECORD ON APPEAL GT PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
11/16/1989RECEIVED PRO SE LETTER FROM APPELLANT REQUESTING APPOINTMENT OF COUNSEL RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
11/21/1989MISCELLANEOUS PROCEDURAL MOTION OF APLT (PRO SE) FOR APPOINT- MENT OF COUNSEL UNDER C.J.A. GG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
01/23/1990SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #1 (215 PGS - SWARINGER) (SEE 89-1188 FOR RT) JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
01/24/1990SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #2 (15 PGS - HUNT) (SEE 89-1188 FOR RT) JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
03/02/1990LETTER REQ. APLT TO COMPLETE FORM 5 AFFI. IN ORDER TO BE CONSIDERD FOR CJA APPTMT SL PANELFF SCDATE 112089 SCHPRD Q
03/12/1990APPELLANT'S MOTION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS APPELLANT'S RJG PANEL SCDATE 040290 SCHPRD CHECK
03/20/1990SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #1(ORDER JUDGE BARNES DATED 1-16-90) AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
04/05/1990APPOINTING COUNSEL/CO REFERRAL (CJA) MINDY A. DANIELS, ESQ. PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
04/05/1990ORDER SEE NOTE FIELDS 02-05. DAS PANELRO SCDATE 032290 SCHPRD TT
04/05/1990SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #4 (6 PGS - FARMER) (SEE 89-1188 FOR RT) JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
04/06/1990SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #5 (6 PGS - WATKINS) (SEE 89-1188 FOR RT) JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
04/25/1990STATEMENT OF APPELLANT PURSUANT TO ORD DATED 4/5/90 RJG PANEL SCDATE 042490 SCHPRD STATE
07/30/1990SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #2 (15 PGS.--HUNT) PR PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
09/05/1990SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #3 (ORDER OF JUDGE C.M. LONG DATED JULY 27, 1990) RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
10/22/1990SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #4 (45-PGS/SWARINGER) AJ PANEL SCDATE 111990 SCHPRD RT
11/14/1990RECEIVED PRO SE LETTER FROM APPELLANT RE: INEFFECTIVE ASSISTANCE OF COUNSEL RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
12/06/1990LETTER TO COUNSEL FOR APLT REFERRING LTR FROM APLT RECVD 11/14/90 SL PANELFF SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
12/16/1990ANSWER/RESPONSE FROM CNSL FOR APLT TO 12/6/90 LTR FROM COURT PANEL SCDATE 121790 SCHPRD ANS
01/17/1991LETTER REFERRING LTR RECVD ON 1/9/91 FROM APLT TO COUNSEL SL PANELFF SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
01/29/1991LETTER FROM COUNSEL FOR APLT IN RESPONSE TO THIS COURT'S LTR SL PANEL SCDATE 012891 SCHPRD ANS
05/07/1991SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #6 (ORDER OF JUDGE LONG DATED 4/18/91) RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
06/12/1991ORDER SEE NOTE FIELDS 06-08. DAS PANELRBH SCDATE 061291 SCHPRD X
08/20/1991ORDER CNSL FR APLT TO FL BRF IN 10 DAYS OR APMT VACATED. EVH PANELFE SCDATE 081691 SCHPRD V
08/30/1991APPELLANT'S MOTION FOR STAY BRIEFING SCHEDULE PEND. DISP. OF 23-110 MOTION IN TRIAL CRT RJG PANEL SCDATE 083091 SCHPRD BA
09/23/1991ORDER SEE NOTE FIELDS 09-11. DAS PANELRO SCDATE 090491 SCHPRD TT
10/23/1991STATEMENT OF APLT RE STATUS OF 23-110 MOTION PMB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
12/02/1991ORDER CNSL FR APLT TO ADVISE CRT IN 30 AS TO STATUS OF 23-110 MO. EVH PANELRBH SCDATE 112691 SCHPRD V
01/02/1992STATEMENT OF APPELLANT RE STATUS OF 23-110 MOTION RJG PANEL SCDATE 011692 SCHPRD STATE
01/07/1992SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #5 (ORDER OF JUDGE C.M. LONG DATED 12/19/91) RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
01/30/1992ORDER SEE NOTE FIELDS 12-15. EVH PANELFE SCDATE 020292 SCHPRD CHECK
02/11/1992APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT AJ PANEL SCDATE 021192 SCHPRD DSA
03/04/1992RECORD ON APPEAL IN 92-30 PR PANEL SCDATE 030392 SCHPRD R
04/06/1992SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #2 (145 pgs/simms) proc. 8/9/91
02/03/1993APPELLANT'S MOTION FOR STAY
03/02/1993ORDER GRANTING APPELLANT MOTION FOR STAY pending resolution of appellant's motion to vacate sentence and for resentencing pursuant to Rule 35 of the Superior Court Rules of Criminal Procedure, and that appellant shall, within 15 days from the date of this order, file a copy of the pending trial court motion with this court. F/O that appellant shall advise this court within 30 days from the date of this order as to the status of the above pending motion filed in the trial court. (By RO)
03/17/1993RECEIVED courtsey copy of motion to vacate sentence and for resentencing filed in superior court
04/22/1993ORDER: Counsel for appellant shall advise this co urt within 30 days from the date of this order as to the status of the appellant's motion to vacate sentence and for resentencing pursuant to Rule 35 of the Superior Court Rules of Criminal Procedure,that was filed with the trial court, accompanied by a motion for leave to file the status out of time. The motion should set forth good cause for thefailure either to timely file the status or to request an extension of time within which to do so. Failure to comply may result in counsel's appointment being vacated. (By RO)
04/29/1993RECEIVED Order from Superior Court.
04/30/1993SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #6 Order (Re: Motion to vacate sentence and for resentencing, 4/27/93 - Judge Long)
05/06/1993MOTION - Appellant's Motion To Remand
05/14/1993APPELLEE'S ANSWER/RESPONSE to aplt's motion to remand case to trial court and to expedite remand
05/25/1993ORDER GRANTING APPELLANT MOTION TO REMAND (By RO)
05/25/1993PROCEED WITH APPEAL, NO LONGER ON HOLD/STAYED
05/25/1993REMANDED
06/16/1993MANDATE ISSUED
12/28/1994MEMORANDUM Appointment voucher issued by Superior Court was paid by this court for the 23-110 motion filed in Superior Court. Voucher # 703139, approved this day by Judge Wagner. amount claimed $644.56 amount paid $644.56