judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

RONALD E. BLUNT V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 89-CF-0903
Short Caption:RONALD E. BLUNT V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Other Felony
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:F8163-88Filed Date:07/06/1989

Opening Event Date:07/06/1989Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:09/12/1989Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:10/10/1991
Argued/Submitted:03/09/1992
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:04/10/1992

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantRonald Blunt N
John A. Briley, Jr.YN
AppelleeUnited StatesN
Henry K. Kopel YN
John R. Fisher YN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901BLUNT, RONALD E. UNITED STATES
01/01/1902SUMMARY II
07/06/1989NOTICE OF APPEAL
09/12/1989RECORD ON APPEAL GT PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
09/12/1989RECORD COMPLETED
09/26/1989APPOINTING COUNSEL/CO REFERRAL (CJA) JOHN A. BRILEY, JR., ESQ. PANEL SCDATE 092289 SCHPRD CHECK
10/06/1989APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT RJG PANEL SCDATE 100689 SCHPRD DSA
07/19/1991ORDER BRF OF APLT DUE BY 9/11/91; BRF OF APLE DUE BY 10/11/91. EVH PANELRBH SCDATE 062891 SCHPRD U
09/11/1991APPELLANT'S BRIEF RJG PANEL SCDATE 091191 SCHPRD BA
10/10/1991APPELEE'S BRIEF RJG PANEL SCDATE 101191 SCHPRD BE
10/10/1991BRIEFS COMPLETED
10/24/1991SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #2 (9 PGS/WRAY) PROC. 1/18/89 PMB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
10/24/1991SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #1 (88-PGS/MOLLICHELLI, 11/29/88) AJ PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
01/29/1992LETTER SUM II ARGUMENT REQUEST NOTCE- 10 DAYS TO RESPOND. CKT PANELJAC SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
03/09/1992FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
03/09/1992SUBMITTED to JJ KG PY RY
03/20/1992AFFIRMED MOJ AF JUDGMENT ON APPEAL (KG PY RY)
04/10/1992MANDATE ISSUED