judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

KENNETH R. PARKER V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 89-CF-0884
Short Caption:KENNETH R. PARKER V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Drug Related
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:F1821-89Filed Date:08/31/1989

Opening Event Date:08/31/1989Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:09/26/1989Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:07/25/1990
Argued/Submitted:11/16/1990
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:12/18/1990

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantKenneth R. Parker N
Donnie E. Wilson YN
AppelleeUnited StatesN
John R. Fisher YN
Gregory E. Jackson YN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901PARKER, KENNETH R. UNITED STATES
08/31/1989FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
09/26/1989FiledRecord Completed
09/26/1989APPOINTING COUNSEL/CO REFERRAL (CJA) DONNIE E. WILSON, ESQ. PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
09/26/1989RECORD ON APPEAL RJG PANEL SCDATE 103089 SCHPRD R
10/04/1989ACTION SLIP MAILED JB PANEL SCDATE 100689 SCHPRD CHECK
10/04/1989APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT JB PANEL SCDATE 100689 SCHPRD DSA
11/01/1989APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF UNTIL 40 DAYS AFTER COMPLETION OF TRANSCRIPTS RJG PANEL SCDATE 111389 SCHPRD BA
12/11/1989ORDER GRANT APLT MO FOR EXT TO FILE BR; APLT BR DUE W/IN 40 DAYS AFTER RT FILED JB PANELRBH SCDATE 111589 SCHPRD U
01/16/1990SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #1 (213-PGS/MOORE) AJ PANEL SCDATE 020490 SCHPRD RT
06/25/1990APPELLANT'S BRIEF PF PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
07/25/1990FiledBriefing Completed
07/25/1990APPELEE'S BRIEF AD PANEL SCDATE 072590 SCHPRD BE
11/16/1990FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
11/16/1990SUBMITTED PANELBEFAGA SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
11/27/1990AFFIRMED MOJ AF SUPERIOR COURT JUDGMENT PANELBEFAGA SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
11/27/1990DISP NO - 01 DISP - AF METH -MOJ JUDGE -PC CITE
12/18/1990MANDATE ISSUED PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD