judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

CURTIS D. MCCLAIN V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 89-CF-0939
Short Caption:CURTIS D. MCCLAIN V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Bail Reform Act
Lead: 89-CF-0915 Consolidated:89-CF-0939
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:F1511-89Filed Date:08/07/1989

Opening Event Date:08/07/1989Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:10/13/1989Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:
Argued/Submitted:
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:09/26/1990

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantCurtis D. Mcclain N
Sheila Thurmond MayersNY
AppelleeUnited StatesN
John R. Fisher NN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901MCCLAIN, CURTIS D. UNITED STATES
01/01/1903NOTE - 01 CON 89-915 NOTE - 01
08/07/1989FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
10/02/1989APPOINTING COUNSEL/CO REFERRAL (CJA) SHEILA T. MAYERS, ESQ. PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
10/02/1989ORDER SS, CONS 89-915 & 89-939; SHEILA MAYERS APPTD FOR APLT; APLT TO FL DSA IN 10 DAYS. DAS PANELRO SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
10/13/1989FiledRecord Completed
10/13/1989RECORD ON APPEAL AD PANEL SCDATE 110689 SCHPRD R
10/27/1989SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #1 (8 PGS. -- BURNS) RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
01/22/1990SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #2(4 PGS/RHOADES) AD PANEL SCDATE 032090 SCHPRD RT
03/05/1990ORDER COUNSEL FOR APPELLANT TO FILE DOCKETING STATEMENT W/IN 10 DAYS FROM DATE OF ORDER JB PANELRBH SCDATE 101289 SCHPRD DSA
03/08/1990APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT AD PANEL SCDATE 031590 SCHPRD DSA
04/06/1990SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #1 (8-PGS/BURNEY) AJ PANEL SCDATE 031990 SCHPRD RT
04/12/1990ACTION SLIP MAILED AJ PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
05/21/1990APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF FOR 30 DAY EXTENSION RJG PANEL SCDATE 052290 SCHPRD BA
06/13/1990ORDER GRANT APLT MO X TM FILE BRF TO 07-13-90. NFX GR PANELDDW SCDATE 060690 SCHPRD GR
07/25/1990ORDER DIRG APLT TO FILE BRIEF W/IN 10 DAYS OR SHOW CAUSE WHY APT SHOULD NOT BE VACATED. FVH PANELRO SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
08/07/1990APPELLANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS/WITHDRAW APPEAL AJ PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
09/04/1990FiledOUTCOME/DISPOSITION - Outcome-Disposition
09/04/1990ORDER GRANTG APLT'S MO & APPEALS ARE DISMISSED. GW PANELRO SCDATE 082490 SCHPRD V
09/04/1990DISP NO - 01 DISP - DS METH -ORD JUDGE -RO CITE
09/05/1990COUNSEL'S MOTION TO WITHDRAW FOR BUSINESS REASONS OF APLT AJ PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
09/26/1990MANDATE ISSUED PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD