Case Information: 44689 | |||
Short Caption: | CHONGDEE VS. FARMERS INS. EXCHANGE | Court: | Supreme Court |
Lower Court Case(s): | Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A465140 | Classification: | Civil Appeal - General - Other |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Disposition Filed/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | 02/22/2005 / Trost, Janet | SP Status: | Completed |
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | How Submitted: | ||
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
02/15/2005 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee due. | ||
02/15/2005 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Settlement. Notice re: settlement conference program/suspension of rules mailed to all counsel. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) | 05-03050 | |
02/15/2005 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to Pay Supreme Court Filing Fee. Due Date: 10 days | ||
02/16/2005 | Filing Fee | Received Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $250.00 from Robert D. Vannah - check no. 73517. | ||
02/22/2005 | Settlement Notice | Issued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Janet Trost. (Briefing and preparation of transcripts suspended pending further order of this court.) | ||
02/22/2005 | Filing Fee | Returned Filing Fee. Check No. 73605 returned to Robert D. Vannah. Filing fee paid on 2/16/05. | ||
03/02/2005 | Docketing Statement | Filed Docketing Statement. Issued Notice to Provide Proof of Service on Settlement Judge. | 05-04030 | |
03/09/2005 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Proof of Service. Docketing Statement served on settlement judge. | 05-04755 | |
04/20/2005 | Settlement Program Report | Filed Interim Settlement Program Report. The settlement conference is continued to the following date: April 27, 2005. | 05-07683 | |
05/31/2005 | Settlement Program Motion/Stipulation | Filed Settlement Program/Stipulated Dismissal. | 05-10630 | |
05/31/2005 | Settlement Agreement | Filed Settlement Agreement. | 05-10631 | |
06/16/2005 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Stipulated Dismissal. Pursuant to the settlement conference, the stipulation of the parties and cause appearing, " . . . this appeal is dismissed." The parties shall bear their own costs. NRAP 42(b). SNP/CLK | 05-11817 | |
06/16/2005 | Case Status Update | Case Closed. No remittitur issued. |