judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

BRINDA FROST v. MICHAEL and RITA ALLRED, husband and wife

Case Heading (06-24)
Case Number:06-24Case Docketed On:03/06/2006
Status:Closed
Original Court:Ninth Judicial District Fremont CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Civil - Common Law - Personal Injury
Short Title:BRINDA FROST v. MICHAEL and RITA ALLRED, husband and wife
Full Title:BRINDA FROST, Appellant (Plaintiff), v. MICHAEL and RITA ALLRED, husband and wife, Appellees (Defendants).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantBrinda FrostJohn C. Schumacher
Mark J. White
AppelleeMichael AllredGary R. Scott
AppelleeRita AllredGary R. Scott

- Case Decision Information
Issues:
Opinion Number:2006 WY 155
Citation:

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
02/06/2006Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
02/06/2006Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
02/06/2006Fees - Docket fee receivedFeesDocket fee receivedFinal
02/06/2006Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
03/23/2006Brief - Appellant; and received copy of brief on disk.BriefAppellantFinal
03/23/2006Notice-Incoming - Amended indexNotice-IncomingAmended indexFinal
05/01/2006Brief - AppelleesBriefAppelleeFinal
05/19/2006Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appealNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
05/24/2006Record - Transmitted record on appeal, four volumes. Volumes I & II, original papers; Volume III, transcripts; Volume IV, exhibits.RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
05/24/2006Notice-Outgoing - Transmitted record on appeal filedNotice-OutgoingTransmitted record on appeal filedFinal
07/13/2006Order - Oral argument scheduled. The University of Wyoming for the annual bar meeting.OrderOral argument scheduledFinal
08/16/2006Event - Oral argument presented. Argued before full court (John Schumacher for appellant; Gary R. Scott for appellees) and taken under advisement.EventOral argument presentedFinal
12/15/2006Notice-Internal - Oral argument noticeNotice-InternalOral argument noticeFinal
12/15/2006Opinion - Opinion and journal order affirming. Chief Justice Voigt writing for the court.OpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
01/03/2007Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
01/03/2007Record - Record returned to district courtRecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
01/03/2007Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
01/03/2007Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal