judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

GROSS (LEMONT) VS. STATE C/W 33984

Case Information: 33262
Short Caption:GROSS (LEMONT) VS. STATE C/W 33984Court:Supreme Court
Consolidated:33262*, 33984 Related Case(s): 33984
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C130622Classification:Criminal Appeal - Other - Post-Conviction/Proper Person
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:05/17/1999How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
11/04/1998Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
11/04/1998Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day.
11/10/1998Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to Transmit Required Document. (Judgment filed 9/17/98; notice of entry filed 9/22/98). Due Date: 10 days
11/16/1998Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled District Court Order/Judgment. Certified copies of Findings of Fact, Conclusions of Law and Order filed in district court on 9/17/98; and notice of entry of order filed in district court on 9/22/98.
01/19/1999Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Transmit Record and Directing Response. Record due: 120 days. fn1--[The record shall not include any exhibits filed in the district court.] Nos. 33262, 33289, 33318, 33402, 33463, 33464, 33465, 33479, 33480, 33481, 33523.
05/17/1999Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal Copy. Vols. 1 and 2. Mailed on 5/13/99.
05/17/1999Case Status Update Submitted for Decision.
09/02/1999Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Consolidation. This court hereby consolidates these appeals. A copy of the complete trial court record has been filed in Docket No. 33262. Therefore, this court vacates the order filed in Docket No. 33984 on May 19, 1999, directing the clerk of the district court to transmit the record on appeal. Nos. 33262, 33984. 99-08236
05/17/2001Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. We conclude that appellant is not entitled to relief and that briefing and oral argument are unwarranted. "ORDER the judgments of the district court AFFIRMED." fn10[We have considered all proper person documents filed or received in these matters, and we conclude that the relief requested is not warranted.] NNP01A-MS/DA/RR Nos. 33262/33984. 01-08243
06/12/2001RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 01-08433
06/12/2001Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
07/05/2001RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on June 19, 2001. 01-08433